EP3603616 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING ORAL COMPOSITION, AND ORAL COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Well Stone Co. 6742-1 Tanochokou Miyazaki-shi, Miyazaki 889-1701 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII, Yoichi 122-1 Tsurunoshima 3-chome Miyazaki-shi Miyazaki 880-0014 / JP | 02 /
OKAMOTO, Takeshi 405 5-33 Tanigawa 2-chome Miyazaki-shi Miyazaki 880-0908 / JP | 03 /
MAKINO, Sayaka No.205 Komodo Hanayamate 5-6 Hanayamate-nishi 1-chome Miyazaki-shi Miyazaki 880-0939 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | Application number, filing date | 18770634.6 | 16.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP10579 | Priority number, date | JP20170054772 | 21.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017054772 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018173970 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603616 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61K8/98, A61K35/02, A61K35/62, A61K36/13, A61P1/02, A61P11/04, A61Q11/00, A61K8/9789, A61K9/00, A61K9/08, A61K9/16, A61K47/46, A61K9/19 | [2020/49] | CPC: |
A61P1/02 (EP,KR,US);
A61K35/62 (EP,KR,US);
A61K8/987 (EP,KR,US);
A61K47/46 (EP);
A61K8/9789 (EP);
A61K9/006 (EP);
A61K9/0063 (EP);
A61K9/08 (EP);
A61K9/1664 (EP);
| C-Set: |
A61K35/62, A61K2300/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | A61K8/98, A61K35/02, A61K35/62, A61K36/13, A61P1/02, A61P11/04, A61Q11/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ORALEN ZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND ORALE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2020/06] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING ORAL COMPOSITION, AND ORAL COMPOSITION | [2020/06] | French: | COMPOSITION POUR CAVITÉ BUCCALE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE CELLE-CI | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 20.06.2019 | Translation filed | 20.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 20.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 20.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.06.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 25.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CZ4906U (SAVRDA ZDENEK [CZ], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0002] - paragraph [0010]; examples 1,6; claim - *; | [Y]EP2255819 (INMOBILIARIA ALGECIRAS LTDA [CL], et al) [Y] 1-10 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0028] ** paragraphs [0036] , [0062] , [0072] - paragraph [0081] *; | [Y]CN103006531 (UNIV ZHEJIANG A & F) [Y] 1-10 * Summary of the invention;; examples 1-6; table 1 *; | [XP]WO2017134948 (WELL STONE CO [JP]) [XP] 1-8 * paragraph [0001] - paragraphs [0003] , [0005] - [0012] * * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0035]; examples 1-4 *; | [E]EP3412318 (WELL STONE CO [JP]) [E] 1-8 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0035]; example 2; claim - * | International search | [A]CN102144722 (JINGMAN WANG) [A] 1-10 * , claims, abstract, paragraph [0038], etc. (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2012197193 (HOTOKU:KK) [A] 1-10 * , claims, paragraph [0005], examples, etc. (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2013180995 (NIPPON PAPER GROUP INC) [A] 1-10 * , claims, examples, etc. (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015093818 (KONIKKO TETSUYA) [A] 1-10 * , claims, paragraphs [0005], [0015], examples, etc. (Family: none) *; | [PA]JP6100411B (WELL STONE KK) [PA] 1-10* , claims, examples, etc. & JP 2017-136153 A & WO 2017/134948 A & CN 107019814 A & KR 10-2017-0092093 A * |