EP3605692 - SUBSTRATE WITH ELECTRODE LAYER FOR METAL SUPPORT TYPE ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT, ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT, ELECTROCHEMICAL MODULE, SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Osaka Gas Co., Ltd. 1-2, Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ECHIGO Mitsuaki c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD. 1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 02 /
OHNISHI Hisao c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD. 1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 03 /
TSUDA Yuji c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD. 1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 04 /
MANABE Kyohei c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD. 1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 05 /
MINAMI Kazuyuki c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD. 1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | 06 /
YAMAZAKI Osamu c/o OSAKA GAS CO. LTD. 1-2 Hiranomachi 4-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541-0046 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | LBP Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Lemcke, Brommer & Partner Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Siegfried-Kühn-Straße 4 76135 Karlsruhe / DE | Application number, filing date | 18770639.5 | 22.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP11441 | Priority number, date | JP20170056731 | 22.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017056731 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018174167 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605692 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/1213, H01M4/86, H01M4/88, H01M8/12, H01M8/1286, H01M8/0612 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
H01M4/8807 (EP,US);
H01M8/1226 (KR,US);
H01M4/8896 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/8605 (US);
H01M4/8878 (US);
H01M4/8882 (EP,US);
H01M4/8885 (KR);
H01M4/8892 (US);
H01M8/12 (EP);
H01M8/124 (KR);
H01M8/1286 (EP,KR,US);
H01M8/2432 (KR);
H01M2004/8684 (US);
H01M2008/1293 (KR,US);
Y02E60/50 (EP,KR);
Y02P70/50 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | SUBSTRAT MIT ELEKTRODENSCHICHT FÜR ELEKTROCHEMISCHES METALLTRÄGERELEMENT, ELEKTROCHEMISCHES ELEMENT, ELEKTROCHEMISCHES MODUL, FESTOXIDBRENNSTOFFZELLE UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/06] | English: | SUBSTRATE WITH ELECTRODE LAYER FOR METAL SUPPORT TYPE ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT, ELECTROCHEMICAL ELEMENT, ELECTROCHEMICAL MODULE, SOLID OXIDE FUEL CELL, AND MANUFACTURING METHOD | [2020/06] | French: | SUBSTRAT AVEC COUCHE D'ÉLECTRODE POUR ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE DE TYPE SUPPORT MÉTALLIQUE, ÉLÉMENT ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE, MODULE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE, PILE À COMBUSTIBLE À OXYDE SOLIDE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 08.10.2019 | Translation filed | 08.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 20.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]JP2010218759 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO) [X] 1,3-7 * paragraphs [0007] - [0024] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraphs [0051] - [0052] * [A] 2,11-13 [Y] 8-10; | [XAY]US2013189606 (RUETTINGER MATTHIAS [AT], et al) [X] 2-7 * paragraphs [0007] - [0024] * [A] 1,8-10 [Y] 11-13; | [YA]WO2016043328 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 8-13 * abstract * [A] 1-7; | [P]EP3196966 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [P] * paragraphs [0066] - [0086] * | International search | [XYA]JP2007012361 (NISSAN MOTOR) [X] 1, 5-7 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0018]-[0022], fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 2 [A] 3-4, 8-13; | [XYA]JP2010218759 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO) [X] 1, 3-9 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0024], [0061]-[0064], [0073], fig. 1 (Family: none) * [Y] 2, 11-12 [A] 10, 13; | [A]JP2011228280 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 2, 11-12* , claim 1, paragraphs [0012], [0013], [0031], fig. 1 (Family: none) *; | [Y]WO2016043328 (OSAKA GAS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 2, 11-12 * , claims 1-4, paragraphs [0029]-[0032], [0051], [0055], [0101]-[0105], fig. 1 & EP 3196966 A1, claims 1-4, paragraphs [0029]-[0032], [0051], [0057], [0110]-[0116], fig.1 & US 2017/0309941 A1 * | by applicant | - JONG-JIN CHOIDONG-SOO PARK, "Preparation of Metal-supported SOFC using Low Temperature Ceramic Coating Process", Proceedings of 11th European SOFC & SOE Forum, (20140701), vol. A1502, pages 14,117 - 20,117 |