EP3606251 - INFORMATION SENDING METHOD AND APPARATUS, TERMINAL AND STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.05.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 08.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FANG, Huiying ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 02 /
DAI, Bo ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 03 /
LIU, Kun ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | 04 /
YANG, Weiwei ZTE Plaza Keji Road South Hi-Tech Industrial Park Nanshan Shenzhen Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Tiburzi, Andrea, et al Barzanò & Zanardo Roma S.p.A. Via Piemonte 26 00187 Roma / IT | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18770872.2 | 23.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018CN80342 | Priority number, date | CN201710184568 | 24.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710184568 | [2020/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018171760 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606251 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3606251 | Date: | 27.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00, H04W72/21, H04L27/18 | [2023/16] | CPC: |
H04L5/0044 (EP,CN);
H04W72/20 (CN);
H04W72/1263 (US);
H04J13/0048 (US);
H04J13/0062 (US);
H04L27/18 (EP);
H04L5/0005 (EP);
H04L5/0007 (EP);
H04L5/0055 (EP,CN,US);
H04L5/0091 (EP);
H04L5/0094 (EP,US);
H04W4/80 (US);
H04W72/21 (EP);
H04W72/53 (US);
H04W74/0833 (US);
H04W80/08 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/52] | H04W72/12, H04L5/00, H04L27/18, H04W74/08 | ||
Former IPC [2020/06] | H04W72/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSSENDEVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG, ENDGERÄT UND SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2020/06] | English: | INFORMATION SENDING METHOD AND APPARATUS, TERMINAL AND STORAGE MEDIUM | [2020/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL D'ENVOI D'INFORMATIONS, TERMINAL ET SUPPORT D'INFORMATIONS | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 24.10.2019 | Translation filed | 24.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 24.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 15.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.05.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 22.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 22.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.09.2023 | CZ | 27.09.2023 | DK | 27.09.2023 | EE | 27.09.2023 | ES | 27.09.2023 | FI | 27.09.2023 | HR | 27.09.2023 | IT | 27.09.2023 | LT | 27.09.2023 | LV | 27.09.2023 | NL | 27.09.2023 | PL | 27.09.2023 | RO | 27.09.2023 | RS | 27.09.2023 | SE | 27.09.2023 | SK | 27.09.2023 | SM | 27.09.2023 | NO | 27.12.2023 | GR | 28.12.2023 | IS | 27.01.2024 | PT | 29.01.2024 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/26] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
IT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
PL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 27.09.2023 | |
CZ | 27.09.2023 | ||
EE | 27.09.2023 | ||
ES | 27.09.2023 | ||
FI | 27.09.2023 | ||
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RO | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SK | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
PT | 29.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
SM | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
IS | 27.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/14] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
NL | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
HR | 27.09.2023 | ||
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
LV | 27.09.2023 | ||
RS | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 27.09.2023 | |
LT | 27.09.2023 | ||
SE | 27.09.2023 | ||
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 27.09.2023 | |
NO | 27.12.2023 | ||
GR | 28.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2018175042 (QUALCOMM INC [US]) [E] 1-4,11,15 * paragraph [0093] - paragraph [0186] ** paragraph [0188] - paragraph [0217] *; | [XAI] - INTEL CORPORATION, "DL gaps and remaining details of timing relationships for NB-IoT", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, South Korea; 20160411 - 20160415, (20160406), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-162973, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_84b/Docs/, (20160406), XP051080732 [X] 1-4,11,15 * Sections 1-4 * [A] 12-14 [I] 5-10 | [XAI] - ERICSSON, "NB-IoT - Uplink control information", vol. RAN WG1, no. Sophia Antipolis, FRANCE; 20160322 - 20160324, (20160316), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-161875, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_AH/LTE_NB-IoT_1603/Docs/, (20160316), XP051080992 [X] 1-4,11,15 * Sections 1-4 * [A] 12-14 [I] 5-10 | [XAI] - SHARP, "A/N resource indication for NB-IoT", vol. RAN WG1, no. Busan, Korea; 20160411 - 20160415, (20160406), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-162836, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_84b/Docs/, (20160406), XP051080728 [X] 1-4,11,15 * Sections 1-3 * [A] 12-14 [I] 5-10 | [XAI] - NOKIA ET AL, "Scheduling Request Multiplexing with ACK/NACK", vol. RAN WG1, no. Gothenburg, Sweden; 20160822 - 20160826, (20160812), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-166593, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86/Docs/, (20160812), XP051132531 [X] 1,2,4,15 * Sections 1-3 * [A] 12-14 [I] 3,5-11 | International search | [A]WO2017014606 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-26* , entire document *; | [XY] - SHARP, "A/N Resource Indication for NB-IoT", 3GPPTSG RAN WG1 Meeting #84bis R1-162836, (20160415), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_84b/Docs/, XP051080728 [X] 1,4-16,20-26 * , section 2, "Discussions", section 2, "Discussions" * [Y] 2, 3 | [Y] - ERICSSON, "NB-IoT-Remaining Issues for NPRACH", 3GPPTSG RAN WG1 Meeting #84-bis R1-162779, (20160415), URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_84b/Docs/, XP051080723 [Y] 2,3 * , sections 1 and 2.1 * |