EP3602761 - POWER GATE RAMP-UP CONTROL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/06] | POWER GATE RAMP-UP CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
[2023/16] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 04.08.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.04.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTEL Corporation 2200 Mission College Blvd. Santa Clara, CA 95054 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KILADA, Eliyah 15917 NW Graf Street Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | 02 /
MOZAK, Christopher 3000 NW Circle A Drive Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | [2020/14] |
Former [2020/06] | 01 /
KILADA, Eliyah 15917 NW Graf Street Portland, Oregon 97229 / US | ||
02 /
MOZAK, Christopher 16648 SW Delta Court Beaverton, Oregon 97006 / US | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2023/36] |
Former [2020/06] | HGF Limited Fountain Precinct Balm Green Sheffield S1 2JA / GB | Application number, filing date | 18771236.9 | 22.02.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US19280 | Priority number, date | US201715466688 | 22.03.2017 Original published format: US201715466688 | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018175035 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3602761 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3602761 | Date: | 06.09.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/36] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/3287, G11C5/14, H03K17/10, H03K17/16, H03K19/00, H03K19/0175 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
G06F1/3287 (EP,US);
H02M1/08 (KR);
H03K17/145 (US);
G11C5/148 (EP,US);
H03K17/102 (EP,US);
H03K17/163 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | H02M1/08 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR EINE LEISTUNGSTORRAMPE | [2023/16] | English: | POWER GATE RAMP-UP CONTROL APPARATUS | [2023/16] | French: | APPAREIL D'ACCÉLÉRATION DE PORTE DE PUISSANCE | [2023/16] |
Former [2020/06] | STEUERUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN FÜR EINE LEISTUNGSTORRAMPE | ||
Former [2020/06] | POWER GATE RAMP-UP CONTROL APPARATUS AND METHOD | ||
Former [2020/06] | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'ACCÉLÉRATION DE PORTE DE PUISSANCE | Entry into regional phase | 28.06.2019 | National basic fee paid | 28.06.2019 | Search fee paid | 28.06.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.06.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.06.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 09.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.12.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.09.2023 | CZ | 06.09.2023 | DK | 06.09.2023 | EE | 06.09.2023 | ES | 06.09.2023 | FI | 06.09.2023 | HR | 06.09.2023 | IT | 06.09.2023 | LT | 06.09.2023 | LV | 06.09.2023 | PL | 06.09.2023 | RO | 06.09.2023 | RS | 06.09.2023 | SE | 06.09.2023 | SI | 06.09.2023 | SK | 06.09.2023 | SM | 06.09.2023 | NO | 06.12.2023 | GR | 07.12.2023 | IS | 06.01.2024 | PT | 08.01.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
DK | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/26] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
IT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
PL | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 06.09.2023 | |
CZ | 06.09.2023 | ||
EE | 06.09.2023 | ||
ES | 06.09.2023 | ||
FI | 06.09.2023 | ||
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RO | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SK | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
PT | 08.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
SM | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
IS | 06.01.2024 | ||
Former [2024/10] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
HR | 06.09.2023 | ||
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
LV | 06.09.2023 | ||
RS | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | FI | 06.09.2023 | |
LT | 06.09.2023 | ||
SE | 06.09.2023 | ||
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 06.09.2023 | |
NO | 06.12.2023 | ||
GR | 07.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2013106494 (TAKAYANAGI TOSHINARI [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0053] - paragraph [0060] ** figure 3 *; | [XI]US2015249452 (TAN HONG YUN [MY], et al) [X] 1-4,6-15 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0052] * * figures 1-6 * [I] 5 | International search | [A]JP2008065732 (NEC ELECTRONICS CORP) [A] 1-25* See the whole document. *; | [A]US2011198942 (TAKAYANAGI TOSHINARI [US], et al) [A] 1-25 * See claims 1-23 and figures 1-12. *; | [A]US2011320843 (LEE HEON-HEE [KR], et al) [A] 1-25 * See claims 1-14 and figures 1-5. *; | [XA]US2013106494 (TAKAYANAGI TOSHINARI [US], et al) [X] 1-9,16-25 * See paragraphs [32]-[69],[88]-[97], claims 1,6,24 and figures 1-11. * [A] 10-15; | [A]JP2014003594 (SEMICONDUCTOR ENERGY LAB) [A] 1-25 * See the whole document. * | by applicant | US2013106494 | US2015249452 |