EP3603581 - BASE PLATE TRIAL HOLDING APPARATUS AND KNEE IMPLANT SURGICAL INSTRUMENT SET COMPRISING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 05.07.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 28.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 16.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corentec Co., Ltd. 12 Yeongsanhong 1-gil Ipjang-myeon Seobuk-gu Cheonan-si, Chungcheongnam-do 31056 / KR | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Seung-Hun 2FL. 6-3 Geobukgol-ro 18-gil Seodaemun-gu Seoul 03691 / KR | 02 /
KIM, Chan-Eol 502 Jung-woo Hometown 70 Sangam-ro 39-gil Gangdong-gu Seoul 05306 / KR | 03 /
KIM, Seok-Joo 302 Keumkang Shervile 41-7 World Cup-ro 12-gil Mapo-gu Seoul 04003 / KR | 04 /
YOO, Oui-Sik 11FL. Chung-ho Tower 483 Gangnam-daero Seocho-gu Seoul 06541 / KR | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18771519.8 | 19.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018KR03176 | Priority number, date | KR20170037830 | 24.03.2017 Original published format: KR 20170037830 | [2020/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018174495 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603581 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3603581 | Date: | 30.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/46, A61B17/56, A61B17/16, A61B17/17, A61F2/38, // A61B17/00, A61F2/30, A61B90/00 | [2021/07] | CPC: |
A61B17/1764 (EP,US);
A61F2/4684 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/56 (KR,US);
A61F2/46 (EP);
A61F2/461 (EP,KR,US);
A61B17/1604 (EP);
A61B17/1675 (EP,US);
A61B2017/0046 (EP);
A61B2017/00477 (EP);
A61B2090/034 (EP);
A61F2/389 (EP,US);
A61F2002/30476 (EP);
A61F2002/30492 (EP);
A61F2002/30565 (EP);
A61F2002/30604 (EP);
A61F2002/30827 (EP);
A61F2002/30884 (EP);
A61F2002/30891 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | A61F2/46, A61B17/56 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | HALTEVORRICHTUNG FÜR GRUNDPLATTENPROBE UND CHIRURGISCHES INSTRUMENTENSET FÜR KNIEIMPLANTAT DAMIT | [2020/06] | English: | BASE PLATE TRIAL HOLDING APPARATUS AND KNEE IMPLANT SURGICAL INSTRUMENT SET COMPRISING SAME | [2020/06] | French: | APPAREIL DE MAINTIEN D'ESSAI D'EMBASE ET ENSEMBLE INSTRUMENT CHIRURGICAL D'IMPLANT DE GENOU COMPRENANT CELUI-CI | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.10.2019 | Translation filed | 16.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 16.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 03.06.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.08.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 30.08.2023 | ES | 30.08.2023 | HR | 30.08.2023 | PL | 30.08.2023 | RO | 30.08.2023 | RS | 30.08.2023 | SK | 30.08.2023 | SM | 30.08.2023 | NO | 30.11.2023 | GR | 01.12.2023 | IS | 30.12.2023 | [2024/23] |
Former [2024/20] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
SM | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 30.08.2023 | |
PL | 30.08.2023 | ||
RS | 30.08.2023 | ||
NO | 30.11.2023 | ||
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | ||
IS | 30.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 30.11.2023 | |
GR | 01.12.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5356414 (COHEN ROBERT C [US], et al) [A] 1-3,7-9,11-13 * column 5, line 38 - column 7, line 65 ** figures 7,8,12,14,15 *; | [XA]EP0780092 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON PROFESSIONAL [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,12,13,15 * column 6, line 50 - column 7, line 52 * * figures 1-6 * [A] 8; | [X]EP1224921 (DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,7,9,10,12,13,15 * paragraphs [0016] - [0042] * * figures 7-12,17-23 *; | [Y]US2005119663 (KEYER THOMAS R [US], et al) [Y] 5,6 * paragraphs [0034] - [0041] * * figure 6 *; | [XA]US2006184176 (STRASZHEIM-MORLEY KRISTINA J [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,9,11-15 * paragraphs [0035] - [0059] * * figures 1-21 * [A] 8; | [XAI]US2008119938 (OH SANG SOO [KR]) [X] 1-4,12,13 * paragraphs [0085] - [0092] * * figures 15-18 * [A] 7 [I] 9; | [XA]US7390327 (COLLAZO CARLOS E [US], et al) [X] 1-4,9,10,12,13 * column 4, line 5 - column 5, line 46 * * figures 1-5 * [A] 7,8; | [XYI]US2009125114 (MAY BRIAN M [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,8,12-15 * paragraphs [0157] - [0171] * * figures 108,110A,110B,114-119 * [Y] 5,6 [I] 9,10; | [XAI]US2015335449 (RIES MICHAEL D [US], et al) [X] 1-4,7,11-13 * paragraphs [0124] - [0131] * * figures 40A-43 * [A] 8 [I] 9 | International search | [Y]US5356414 (COHEN ROBERT C [US], et al) [Y] 3-6 * 1, 38-40; 5, 44-47; 6, 52; 6, 8 *; | [Y]KR20060135633 (SYNTHES GMBH [CH]) [Y] 7-9 * ^ [0034], [0036], [0037]; 6 *; | [Y]KR20080010224 (CORENTEC CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 12 * [0043], [0045], [0046], [0053], [0055], [0056]; 3-5 *; | [Y]KR100822471B (SEO JAI GON [KR], et al)[Y] 1-22; | [XY]JP4316176B (DEPUY ORTHOPAEDICS, INC.) [X] 1-2, 10-11, 13-22 * ^ [0007], [0014], [0015], [0019], [0020], [0022], [0023], [0028], [0038]; 7, 9, 15, 19, 20, 22 * [Y] 3-9, 12 |