EP3606206 - COMMUNICATION DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 25.03.2022 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2021/30] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Sony Corporation 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUDA, Hiroki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 02 /
SHIMEZAWA, Kazuyuki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | 03 /
KUSASHIMA, Naoki c/o SONY CORPORATION 1-7-1 Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Postfach 10 54 62 70047 Stuttgart / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18771648.5 | 06.02.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP03880 | Priority number, date | JP20170059436 | 24.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017059436 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018173515 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606206 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H04L5/00 | [2020/14] | CPC: |
H04L5/0094 (EP,RU,US);
H04L5/0037 (EP,RU);
H04L5/0053 (EP,RU,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | H04W72/02, H04L27/26, H04W72/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | KOMMUNIKATIONSVORRICHTUNG, KOMMUNIKATIONSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2020/06] | English: | COMMUNICATION DEVICE, COMMUNICATION METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2020/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COMMUNICATION, PROCÉDÉ DE COMMUNICATION ET PROGRAMME | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 22.09.2019 | Translation filed | 23.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 18.09.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.07.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - CMCC, "Further Discussion on DCI in NR", vol. RAN WG1, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170212), 3GPP DRAFT; R1-1703408, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN1/Docs/, (20170212), XP051210536 [X] 1-15 * pages 1,2,5 * | International search | [Y]JP2016529807 (HUAWEI TECHNOLOGIES CO., LTD) [Y] 10, 11 * , paragraphs [0256]-[0259], [0287] & US 2016/0165591 A1, paragraphs [0086]-[0088], [0103] & WO 2015/018037 A1 & EP 3030024 A1 & CN 104662978 A & AU 2013397787 A & KR 10-2016-0044501 A *; | [XY] - ZTE et al., "Basic grant-free transmission for URLLC", 3GPP TSG RAN WG1 Meeting #88, R1-1701594, (20170207), pages 1 - 8, (20180314), XP051220813 [X] 1-9, 12, 15-20 * , especially, p. 2, 11. 7-29, p. 1, 11. 1-3, p. 3, 11. 12-20 * [Y] 10, 11, 13, 14 | [Y] - INTEL CORPORATION, "Grant-free UL transmissions in NR", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #86bis R1-1609499, (20161001), pages 1 - 8, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/TSG_RAN/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_86b/Docs/, (20180314), XP051159569 [Y] 10, 11 * , especially, p. 5, section 5, top six lines; p. 6, 11. 22-28 * | [Y] - NOKIA et al., "Grant-free to grant-based switching for URLLC", 3GPP TSG-RAN WG1 #87 R1-1612253, (20161105), pages 1 - 3, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/TSG_RAN/WG1_RL1/TSGR1_87/Docs/, (20180314), XP051190367 [Y] 13, 14 * , espacially, p. 3, 11. 1-6, fig. 3 * |