EP3605178 - SEPARATED LENS AND CAMERA MODULE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 19.08.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ningbo Sunny Opotech Co., Ltd. 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo, Zhejiang 315400 / CN | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Mingzhu 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 02 /
LIU, Chunmei 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Shoujie 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 04 /
GUO, Nan 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 05 /
YAO, Lifeng 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Ningbo Zhejiang 315400 / CN | 06 /
DING, Liang 66-68 Shunyu Road Yuyao City Zhejiang 315400 / CN | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Neumarkterstr. 21 81673 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Gong, Jinping CocreateIP Eggenfeldenerstraße 56 81929 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18771862.2 | 23.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018CN80193 | Priority number, date | CN201710190450 | 24.03.2017 Original published format: CN201710190450 | CN201720294950U | 24.03.2017 Original published format: CN 201720294950 U | [2020/06] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018171714 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | ZH | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3605178 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G02B7/02, G02B7/00, G02B13/00 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G02B7/021 (EP,KR,US);
G02B13/0015 (KR);
G02B13/001 (EP);
G02B13/0045 (US);
G02B5/003 (KR);
G02B7/023 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | G02B7/02, G02B7/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | GETRENNTE LINSE UND KAMERAMODUL | [2020/06] | English: | SEPARATED LENS AND CAMERA MODULE | [2020/06] | French: | LENTILLE SÉPARÉE ET MODULE DE CAMÉRA | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2019 | Translation filed | 02.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 02.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 02.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 11.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.08.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2007065515 (RICOH KK) [Y] 2-4,6-8,10,11,13-17 * figure 1 *; | [Y]CN201344989Y (SHANGHAI MICROELECTRONICS EQUI [CN]) [Y] 2-4,6-8,10,11,13-17 * figure 3 *; | [XY]CN105487248 (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [X] 1,5,9,12,18 * figures 1-13 * [Y] 2-4,6-8,10,11,13-17; | [XY]CN205594216U (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [X] 1,5,9,12,18 * figure 4; claim 9 *[Y] 2-4,6-8,10,11,13-17 | International search | [X]CN102023361 (HONGFUJIN PREC IND SHENZHEN, et al) [X] 1-24 * , description, paragraphs [0009]-[0018], and figures 1 and 2 *; | [X]KR20140076761 (SAMSUNG ELECTRO MECH [KR]) [X] 1-24* , description, paragraphs [0028]-[0050], and figures 1-10 *; | [X]US2014340771 (WAKABAYASHI HIROSHI [CN], et al) [X] 1-25 * , description, paragraphs [0029]-[0048], and figures 1-10 *; | [X]CN105445889 (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [X] 1-25 * , description, paragraphs [0073]-[0178], and figures 1-10 *; | [X]CN105487190 (NINGBO SUNNY OPTICAL TECH CO) [X] 1-25 * , description, paragraphs [0058]-[0115], and figures 1-10 *; | [PX]CN107238909 (ZHEJIANG SUNNY OPTICS CO LTD) [PX] 1-25 * , description, paragraphs [0048]-[0059], and figures 1-10 * |