EP3599992 - INTRAOCULAR PRESSURE SENSOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 29.09.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Board Of Trustees Of Michigan State University 450 Administration Building East Lansing, Michigan 48824-1046 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Wen 2069 Hamilton Rd. Unit 3 Okemos Michigan 48824 / US | 02 /
WEBER, Arthur J. 1136 Hitching Post Road East Lansing Michigan 48823 / US | 03 /
KOUHANI, Mohammad Hossein Mazaheri 3636 Coleman Road East Lansing Michigan 48823 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Hirsch & Associés 29bis, rue d' Astorg 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Hirsch & Associés 137, rue de l'Université 75007 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 18772211.1 | 21.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US23502 | Priority number, date | US201762474750P | 22.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762474750 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018175539 | Date: | 27.09.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3599992 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.09.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.09.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/16, G01B7/16, A61B5/07, G02C7/04, A61B5/0215, A61B5/0205, A61B5/11, A61B5/145, A61B5/00, G01L9/00, G01L19/10 | [2020/52] | CPC: |
G02C7/04 (EP);
A61B3/16 (EP,US);
A61B5/0205 (EP);
A61B5/0215 (EP);
A61B5/07 (US);
A61B5/1107 (EP);
A61B5/14507 (EP);
A61B5/6833 (EP);
G01L19/10 (EP);
G01L9/0004 (EP,US);
G01L9/0005 (EP,US);
G01L9/0094 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | A61B3/16, G01B7/16, A61B5/07, G02C7/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | INTRAOKULARER DRUCKSENSOR | [2020/06] | English: | INTRAOCULAR PRESSURE SENSOR | [2020/06] | French: | CAPTEUR DE PRESSION INTRAOCULAIRE | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 04.06.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]FR3005562 (OPHTIMALIA [FR]) [X] 1-3,10-15 * page 6, line 28 - page 19, line 10 * * figures 1, 2 * [Y] 4-9; | [X]CN204218877U (BEIJING HENGSHI YUANDA MEDICAL TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1,3,10,12 * paragraphs [0021] - [0022] * * figures 1, 2 *; | [Y] - KOUHANI MOHAMMAD HOSSEIN MAZAHERI ET AL, "Wireless intraocular pressure sensor using stretchable variable inductor", 2017 IEEE 30TH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON MICRO ELECTRO MECHANICAL SYSTEMS (MEMS), IEEE, (20170122), doi:10.1109/MEMSYS.2017.7863467, pages 557 - 560, XP033069631 [Y] 4-9 * page 558, column l - page 560, column l * * figures 2-4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.2017.7863467 | International search | [A]US2013184554 (ELSHEIKH AHMED [GB], et al) [A] 1-23 * Entire document. *; | [A]US2014243645 (LEONARDI MATTEO [CH]) [A] 1-23 * Entire document. *; | [Y]US2015073253 (BOUWSTRA SIEBE [NL], et al) [Y] 21 * Entire document, especially para [0052]-[0053] and fig. 1A. *; | [A]US2015087953 (CHIOU JIN-CHERN [TW], et al) [A] 1-23* Entire document. *; | [A]US2016051143 (RICKARD MATTHEW [US], et al) [A] 1-23 * Entire document. *; | [XYA] - M. H. M. KOUHANI et al., "Wireless intraocular pressure sensor using stretchable variable inductor", 2017 IEEE 30th International Conference on Micro Electro Mechanical Systems (MEMS, Las Vegas, NV, (20170228), pages 557 - 560, XP033069631 [X] 1-14, 18-20, 22-23 * . Pg 557, para 7-8, pg 558, para 1 and 3, pg 560 , para 1 and figs. 1-5 and 8. https://ieeexplore-ieeeorg.turing.library.northwestern.edu/document/7863467/ * [Y] 21 [A] 15-17 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/MEMSYS.2017.7863467 | by applicant | US2016051144 | US9289123 |