12.07.2024 |
Change - applicant |
published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] |
22.03.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.04.2024 [2024/17] |
15.03.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
15.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
15.03.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
22.11.2023 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
14.10.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
12.10.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
14.06.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
05.02.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
05.11.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
03.11.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
27.09.2021 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.05.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
28.05.2021 |
First examination report |
|
04.05.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
04.12.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
04.12.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 06.01.2021 [2021/01] |
03.11.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.07.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
05.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.04.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
10.04.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
03.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|