EP3692252 - VALVE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 22.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 28.05.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Change - applicant | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PHINIA Delphi Luxembourg SARL 5, Avenue du Swing 4367 Belvaux / LU | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/17] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies IP Limited Erin Court, Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | ||
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Delphi Technologies IP Limited Erin Court, Bishop's Court Hill St. Michael / BB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ENTERS, Richard 10 rue des Blardières 41350 Vineuil / FR | [2020/33] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2024/17] |
Former [2020/33] | Delphi France SAS c/o Delphi Technologies Campus Saint Christophe Bâtiment Galilée 2 10, avenue de l'Entreprise 95863 Cergy Pontoise Cedex / FR | Application number, filing date | 18773495.9 | 01.10.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018EP76683 | Priority number, date | FR20170059204 | 02.10.2017 Original published format: FR 1759204 | [2020/33] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068657 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692252 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3692252 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | FR | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | F02M63/00, F02M61/18 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
F02M61/1886 (EP,US);
F16K1/385 (US);
F02M61/1893 (EP,US);
F02M63/0073 (EP,US);
F02M63/0077 (EP,US);
F16K1/42 (US);
F02M2200/03 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VENTIL | [2020/33] | English: | VALVE | [2020/33] | French: | VALVE | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 04.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 28.05.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.09.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.11.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.11.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE10255328 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1 * figure 1; claim 1 *; | [A]US2011180635 (SPIERS DEAN LEIGH [US], et al) [A] 1 * paragraphs [0018] - [0020]; figures 2,5; claims 1-18 *; | [A]DE102010002637 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0020]; figures 1-4 *; | [A]DE102010040940 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * paragraph [0028]; figures 2-5; claim 1 *; | [A]WO2012059265 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE], et al) [A] 2* figures 1-6 *; | [A]DE102011089360 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * figures 1-4; claims 1-5 *; | [A]WO2014000959 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [A] 1-9 * page 7, lines 17-31; figures 1,3; claims 1-3,8 * | Examination | US2003098074 | US2014190578 | by applicant | EP0957262 |