EP3707562 - DISPENSING NOZZLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.08.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.08.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.11.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 03.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P. 10300 Energy Drive Spring TX 77389 / US | [2020/38] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LUKE, Jeff 11311 Chinden Blvd Boise, Idaho 83714 / US | 02 /
RICHTSMEIER, Dean 11311 Chinden Blvd Boise, Idaho 83714 / US | 03 /
LAVIGNE, Mathew 11311 Chinden Blvd Boise, Idaho 83714 / US | 04 /
FITZGERALD, Sean Daniel 11311 Chinden Blvd Boise, Idaho 83714 / US | [2020/38] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/38] | Appleyard Lees IP LLP 15 Clare Road Halifax HX1 2HY / GB | Application number, filing date | 18773657.4 | 21.05.2018 | [2020/38] | WO2018US33617 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019226146 | Date: | 28.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3707562 | Date: | 16.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G03G15/08, B41J2/175 | [2020/38] | CPC: |
G03G15/0886 (EP,US);
B65D47/10 (US);
B05B15/65 (US);
B41J2/17506 (EP,US);
B65D2547/06 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/38] | Title | German: | ABGABEDÜSEN | [2020/38] | English: | DISPENSING NOZZLES | [2020/38] | French: | BUSES DE DISTRIBUTION | [2020/38] | Entry into regional phase | 10.06.2020 | National basic fee paid | 10.06.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.06.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.06.2020 | Examination requested [2020/38] | 10.06.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 17.03.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.06.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/16] | 19.12.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.06.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.05.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.2023 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]US5673073 (CHILDERS WINTHROP D [US], et al) [Y] 6,7,11-13,15 * column 10, line 62 - column 11, line 34; figures 27-29,35 * * column 12, lines 58-60 *[A] 8-10,14; | [XAY]US6158851 (ZEPEDA ALFRED [US]) [X] 1-5 * column 6, lines 10-54; figures 8-12 * [A] 8-10,14 [Y] 6,7,11-13,15 |