EP3604476 - COLD STORAGE MATERIAL COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR USING COLD STORAGE MATERIAL COMPOSITION, COLD STORAGE MATERIAL AND TRANSPORT CONTAINER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 02.04.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 11.01.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 13.03.2024 [2024/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kaneka Corporation 3-18, Nakanoshima 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8288 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NARAHARA, Risa c/o Osaka Factory KANEKA CORPORATION 5-1-1 Torikainishi Settsu-shi Osaka 566-0072 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18775582.2 | 14.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP10066 | Priority number, date | JP20170065192 | 29.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017065192 | JP20170186204 | 27.09.2017 Original published format: JP 2017186204 | JP20170208053 | 27.10.2017 Original published format: JP 2017208053 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018180506 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604476 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3604476 | Date: | 04.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09K5/06, F28D20/02 | [2020/06] | CPC: |
C09K5/066 (EP);
C09K5/06 (US);
C09K5/063 (US);
F28D20/021 (US);
F28D20/02 (EP);
F28D2020/0026 (EP);
Y02E60/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KÄLTESPEICHERMATERIAL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER KÄLTESPEICHERMATERIAL-ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, KÄLTESPEICHERMATERIAL UND TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER | [2022/18] | English: | COLD STORAGE MATERIAL COMPOSITION, METHOD FOR USING COLD STORAGE MATERIAL COMPOSITION, COLD STORAGE MATERIAL AND TRANSPORT CONTAINER | [2020/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE MATÉRIAU DE STOCKAGE À FROID, PROCÉDÉ D'UTILISATION D'UNE COMPOSITION DE MATÉRIAU DE STOCKAGE À FROID, MATÉRIAU DE STOCKAGE À FROID ET RÉCIPIENT DE TRANSPORT | [2020/06] |
Former [2020/06] | KÜHLLAGERMATERIALZUSAMMENSETZUNG, VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG EINER KÜHLLAGERMATERIALZUSAMMENSETZUNG, KÜHLLAGERMATERIAL UND TRANSPORTBEHÄLTER | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2019 | Translation filed | 29.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2018 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: JP | 29.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 03.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 28.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.01.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 25.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 25.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 07.02.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/15] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 04.05.2022 | AT | 04.05.2022 | CZ | 04.05.2022 | DK | 04.05.2022 | EE | 04.05.2022 | ES | 04.05.2022 | FI | 04.05.2022 | HR | 04.05.2022 | IT | 04.05.2022 | LT | 04.05.2022 | LV | 04.05.2022 | MC | 04.05.2022 | NL | 04.05.2022 | PL | 04.05.2022 | RO | 04.05.2022 | RS | 04.05.2022 | SE | 04.05.2022 | SI | 04.05.2022 | SK | 04.05.2022 | SM | 04.05.2022 | BG | 04.08.2022 | NO | 04.08.2022 | GR | 05.08.2022 | IS | 04.09.2022 | PT | 05.09.2022 | [2024/11] |
Former [2023/48] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
MC | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SI | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 04.05.2022 | |
AT | 04.05.2022 | ||
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
CZ | 04.05.2022 | ||
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
EE | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RO | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
SK | 04.05.2022 | ||
SM | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
DK | 04.05.2022 | ||
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
IS | 04.09.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
PL | 04.05.2022 | ||
RS | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
HR | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
LV | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
BG | 04.08.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
GR | 05.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/48] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
NL | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 04.05.2022 | |
ES | 04.05.2022 | ||
FI | 04.05.2022 | ||
LT | 04.05.2022 | ||
SE | 04.05.2022 | ||
NO | 04.08.2022 | ||
PT | 05.09.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4397752 (KIMURA HIROSHI [JP], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document *; | [XA]US2005133757 (UMEMOTO MASAO [JP]) [X] 1-4,11-13,15 * paragraphs [0025] , [0026] * * example 4; claim - * [A] 5-10,14; | [XA]CN102746829 (BEIJING JINGXIN XIANGNENG TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-4,11-13,15 * the whole document * [A] 5-10,14 | International search | [XA]JPH03281593 (CHUBU ELECTRIC POWER, et al) [X] 1, 3, 9, 11- 13, 15 * , claims 1-4, page 2, upper right column, line 6 to page 5, upper right column, line 14 (Family: none) * [A] 2, 4-8, 10, 14; | [A]JPH0539988 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [A] 1-15* , claims 1-9 & US 5348080 A, claims 1-3 & EP 491402 A2 & CA 2057993 A1 *; | [A]JPH0650686 (TOKYO ELECTRIC POWER CO, et al) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2000144123 (ISHIKAWAJIMA HARIMA HEAVY IND, et al) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-3 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2002071248 (MAEKAWA SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-6 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2008134005 (TAMAGAWA GAKUEN) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-5 (Family: none) *; | [A]JP2015067651 (TOPPAN FORMS CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * , claims 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [XA]WO2016204284 (KANEKA CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4, 11-13, 15 * , claims 1-10, paragraphs [0006], [0014]-[0017], [0026]-[0039], examples 1-16, fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [A] 5-10, 14 | by applicant | JPS6230182 | JPH06158362 | JPH0726250 | JP2002371269 | JP2004307772 | JP2011196580 | JP2015078307 | WO2016204284 |