EP3602125 - 3D IMAGING BY MULTIPLE SENSORS DURING 3D PRINTING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 30.07.2021 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Konica Minolta Laboratory U.S.A., Inc. 2855 Campus Dr. Suite 100 San Mateo, CA 94403 / US | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
AMANO, Jun 740 Endfield Way Hillsborough, CA 94010 / US | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18775897.4 | 16.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018US22982 | Priority number, date | US201762479361P | 31.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762479361 P | US201762479362P | 31.03.2017 Original published format: US 201762479362 P | [2020/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018183003 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3602125 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.02.2020 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/89, G01S17/88, B29C64/00, B29C64/20, B29C64/268, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/00, G06T7/50, G06T7/70, B29C64/10, B33Y50/02, G01S17/87, G06T7/00, B29C64/393 | [2020/12] | CPC: |
G01S17/89 (EP,US);
B29C64/10 (EP,US);
B29C64/386 (US);
B29C64/393 (EP);
B33Y50/02 (EP);
G01S17/87 (EP,US);
G06T7/001 (EP);
G06T2200/04 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30144 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | G01S17/88, G01S17/89, B29C64/00, B29C64/20, B29C64/268, B33Y30/00, B33Y40/00, G06T7/50, G06T7/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | 3D-BILDGEBUNG DURCH MEHRERE SENSOREN WÄHREND DES 3D-DRUCKS | [2020/06] | English: | 3D IMAGING BY MULTIPLE SENSORS DURING 3D PRINTING | [2020/06] | French: | IMAGERIE 3D PAR PLUSIEURS CAPTEURS PENDANT UNE IMPRESSION 3D | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2019 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 13.05.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.08.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2015045928 (PEREZ ALFONSO ALEXANDER [US], et al) [I] 1-15* paragraphs [0022] - [0063] *; | [XI]SE537864 (GUSTAFSSON KATARINA [SE]) [X] 1,7 * paragraphs [0027] , [0034] * [I] 2-6,8-15; | [I] - PITCHAYA SITTHI-AMORN ET AL, "MultiFab : a machine vision assisted platform for multi-material 3D printing", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, 2 Penn Plaza, Suite 701New YorkNY10121-0701USA, (20150727), vol. 34, no. 4, doi:10.1145/2766962, ISSN 0730-0301, pages 1 - 11, XP055665917 [I] 1-15 * paragraphs [04.2] - [05.2] * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2766962 | International search | [A]US2010020306 (HALL DAVID S [US]) [A] 1-7, 12-17 * ; figures 5-7; paragraph [0033]. *; | [A]US2015367447 (BULLER BENYAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-7, 12-17 * ; figuresl, 8; paragraphs [0004, 0202, 0246, 0404]. *; | [A]CN205362676U (ANSHAN DWAYA LASER TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * ; (see machine translation). *; | [XA]US2016210737 (STRAUB JEREMY [US], et al) [X] 8-11 * ; abstract; figures 1A-3, 6; paragraphs [005, 0018, 0024-0029, 0034-0035, 0039, 0061-0064]; claims 19-20. * [A] 1-7, 12-17; | [A]US2018133801 (BULLER BENYAMIN [US], et al) [A] 1-17* ; paragraphs [0004. 0072, 0077, 0173, 0183, 0208, 0368]. * | by applicant | US2015045928 | SE537864 | US2016236414 | - PITCHAYA SITTHI-AMORN et al., "MultiFab: a machine vision assisted platform for multi-material 3D printing", ACM TRANSACTIONS ON GRAPHICS, (20150727), vol. 34, no. 4, doi:10.1145/2766962, pages 1 - 11, XP055665917 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1145/2766962 |