EP3586978 - COATING METHOD AND COATING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2021 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.12.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2021 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2021 [2021/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun, Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HATTORI, Hiroaki c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 02 /
TAKASAKI, Masanori c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 03 /
TSUJI, Masakazu c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 04 /
ISHIZAKI, Go c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | 05 /
FUKUDA, Yasuhide c/o Mazda Motor Corporation 3-1 Shinchi Fuchu-cho Aki-gun Hiroshima 730-8670 / JP | [2020/01] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | [2020/01] | Application number, filing date | 18776342.0 | 14.02.2018 | [2020/01] | WO2018JP05034 | Priority number, date | JP20170069348 | 30.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017069348 | [2020/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018179940 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3586978 | Date: | 01.01.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B05D3/00, B05C5/00, B05C11/00, B05B12/00, B05C5/02, B05C11/10, B25J19/02 | [2020/20] | CPC: |
B05C5/0204 (EP);
B05B13/0431 (US);
B05B12/00 (EP,US);
B05C11/1005 (EP);
B05C11/1021 (EP);
B05C5/0216 (EP);
B05D3/00 (EP);
B05B13/0221 (US);
B05B13/0452 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/01] | B05D3/00, B05C5/00, B05C11/00, B05B12/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/01] | Title | German: | BESCHICHTUNGSVERFAHREN UND BESCHICHTUNGSVORRICHTUNG | [2020/01] | English: | COATING METHOD AND COATING DEVICE | [2020/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE REVÊTEMENT ET DISPOSITIF DE REVÊTEMENT | [2020/01] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2019 | Translation filed | 23.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2019 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/01] | 10.11.2020 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2021/16] | 01.12.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2021/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US4734572 (GORMAN ROBERT R [US]) [Y] 1-7* abstract *; | [XY]DE102008015834 (INOS AUTOMATIONSSOFTWARE GMBH [DE]) [X] 8,9 * abstract * * paragraph [0040] * * paragraph [0047] - paragraph [0049] * [Y] 1-7 | International search | [YA]JPH0556275U (HONDA MOTOR CO., LTD.) [Y] 1-2, 9-11 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0001]-[0007], [0010], [0012], examples, fig. 1-3 (Family: none) * [A] 3-8; | [YA]JP2001149841 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, 9-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0002], [0010], [0015]-[0028], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) * [A] 3-8; | [Y]JP2004016883 (KANTO JIDOSHA KOGYO KK) [Y] 1-2, 9-10 * , claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0002], [0007]-[0014], fig. 1-4 (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2008229444 (STANLEY ELECTRIC CO LTD) [Y] 1-2, 9-11 * , claims, paragraphs [0001]-[0002], [0010], [0016], [0018]-[0020], examples (in particular, paragraphs [0025], [0029], [0037]), drawings (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2010158636 (PANASONIC CORP) [Y] 1-2, 9-11* , claims, paragraphs [0006], [0090]-[0100], [0120] (Family: none) *; | [Y]JP2015205226 (SHIBAURA MECHATRONICS CORP) [Y] 1-2, 9-11 * , claim 1, paragraphs [0010]-[0011], [0044], [0060], [0064], [0068] & CN 105032708 A & KR 10-2015-0120290 A & TW 201540376 A * | by applicant | JP2015199034 |