Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP3600504 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP3600504



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






All documents(58)
Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 784
17.05.2024 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.07.2023 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
15.06.2023 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
05.06.2023 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
05.06.2023 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
05.06.2023 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
05.06.2023 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
01.02.2023 Annex to the communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
01.02.2023 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
01.02.2023 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
01.02.2023 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
01.02.2023 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 95
01.02.2023 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 95
20.12.2022 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
20.12.2022 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
20.12.2022 Claims Search / examination 3
20.12.2022 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
20.12.2022 Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent from 01.04.2012 Search / examination 1
05.09.2022 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 2
05.09.2022 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
05.09.2022 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 1
05.09.2022 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 95
05.09.2022 Text intended for grant (version for approval) Search / examination 95
09.08.2022 Examination started Search / examination 1
18.06.2021 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
18.06.2021 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.06.2021 Abstract Search / examination 1
18.06.2021 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
18.06.2021 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 3
18.06.2021 Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 59
18.06.2021 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 59
18.06.2021 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 3
18.06.2021 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 2
22.12.2020 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.12.2020 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.12.2020 European search opinion Search / examination 5
02.12.2020 Information on Search Strategy Search / examination 1
02.12.2020 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
23.11.2020 Search started Search / examination 1
29.04.2020 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
29.04.2020 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 3
29.04.2020 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 11
29.04.2020 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
09.01.2020 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
06.11.2019 Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee Search / examination 3
04.11.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.11.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
04.11.2019 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
14.10.2019 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
24.09.2019 Information regarding early processing Search / examination 2
02.09.2019 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
02.09.2019 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 5
09.08.2019 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 4
25.02.2019 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
25.02.2019 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
24.10.2018 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 73
04.10.2018 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 1
04.10.2018 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 103