EP3603443 - FINGER FITTING-TYPE MAKEUP TOOL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.05.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 15.03.2023 [2023/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amorepacific Corporation (hangang-ro-2ga) 100, Hangang-daero Yongsan-gu Seoul 04386 / KR | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHO, Yeon Ju 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17074 / KR | 02 /
LEE, Ji Jung 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17074 / KR | 03 /
JEONG, Hae Won 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17074 / KR | 04 /
HAN, Eun Sil 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17074 / KR | 05 /
ROH, Hyun Woo 1920 Yonggu-daero Giheung-gu Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 17074 / KR | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Germain Maureau 12, rue Boileau 69006 Lyon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2020/06] | Delorme, Nicolas, et al Cabinet Germain & Maureau BP 6153 69466 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 18776575.5 | 02.04.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018KR03859 | Priority number, date | KR20170042055 | 31.03.2017 Original published format: KR 20170042055 | [2020/06] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018182384 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | KO | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3603443 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A45D34/04, A45D40/26, A45D33/26, B65D25/02, B65D51/32, A45D34/00, A45D40/00, A45D33/00, A46B5/04 | [2021/01] | CPC: |
A45D34/046 (EP);
A45D34/042 (KR);
A45D40/267 (US);
A45D33/00 (EP);
A45D33/26 (EP,KR,US);
A45D34/00 (EP);
A45D34/04 (EP);
A45D40/00 (EP);
A45D40/26 (EP);
A45D40/262 (KR,US);
A45D40/264 (US);
A46B9/021 (EP);
B65D25/02 (EP,KR);
B65D51/32 (EP,KR);
A45D2033/001 (KR);
A45D2034/002 (KR);
A45D2040/0006 (KR);
A45D2200/1072 (US);
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | A45D34/04, A45D40/26, A45D33/26, B65D25/02, B65D51/32, A45D34/00, A45D40/00, A45D33/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | MAKEUP-WERKZEUG FÜR FINGER | [2020/06] | English: | FINGER FITTING-TYPE MAKEUP TOOL | [2020/06] | French: | OUTIL DE MAQUILLAGE S'ENFILANT SUR UN DOIGT | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2019 | Translation filed | 25.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 02.09.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.05.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.09.2022 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2023/11] | 17.10.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [2023/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.02.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]WO2017007173 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]) [X] 1,4,6 * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0096]; figures 1-11; claims 1-8 * [Y] 7-15 [I] 2; | [Y]KR200476610Y (GEKA GMBH) [Y] 7-15 * figures 1-8 * | International search | [XA]KR20170005968 (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]) [X] 1-6 [A] 7-16; | [A]KR20090005979U [A] 1-16; | [A]KR20110004519U [A] 1-16; | [A]JP2010246854 (HITACHI MAXELL) [A] 1-16; | [A]KR20160107137 (BYUN HYUN JOO [KR]) [A] 1-16; | [E]KR101862858B (AMOREPACIFIC CORP [KR]) [E] 1, 4, 6 | by applicant | KR20170005966 | KR20170005967 | KR20170005968 |