EP3604227 - FERRITE POWDER, RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 277-8557 / JP | [2020/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHII Kazutaka c/o Powdertech Co., Ltd./ 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2778557 / JP | 02 /
AGA Koji c/o Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217,Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2778557 / JP | 03 /
SUGIURA Takao c/o Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi, Chiba 2778557 / JP | 04 /
KOJIMA Takashi c/o Powdertech Co., Ltd. 217, Toyofuta Kashiwa-shi Chiba 2778557 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18778294.1 | 30.03.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP13991 | Priority number, date | JP20170073209 | 31.03.2017 Original published format: JP 2017073209 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018182021 | Date: | 04.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604227 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C01G49/00, G11B5/706, G11B5/714, H01F1/113, C30B29/22, H01F1/11, H01F1/36, H01F1/37 | [2021/02] | CPC: |
C01G49/0036 (EP);
H01F1/11 (US);
B29C41/08 (US);
C01G49/00 (EP);
C30B11/00 (EP);
C30B29/22 (EP);
G11B5/706 (EP);
G11B5/70678 (US);
G11B5/714 (EP,US);
H01F1/113 (EP,US);
C01P2004/04 (US);
C01P2006/12 (US);
C01P2006/42 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | C01G49/00, G11B5/706, G11B5/714, H01F1/113 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | FERRITPULVER, HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMKÖRPER | [2020/06] | English: | FERRITE POWDER, RESIN COMPOSITION, AND MOLDED BODY | [2020/06] | French: | POUDRE DE FERRITE, COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET OBJET MOULÉ | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 16.09.2019 | Translation filed | 16.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 16.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 16.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 19.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4042516 (MATSUMOTO SEIJI, et al) [X] 1-3 * 1st paragraph; examples 1 & 6; claims; col.3, l.20-23 *; | [X]JPS566411 (SUMITOMO SPEC METALS) [X] 1-3 * the whole document *; | [XI]US4765920 (GATTUSO TODD R [US], et al) [X] 1 * col.2, l.29-34; col.4, l.36-40; col. 6, l.60-67; examples * [I] 2,3; | [A]EP1170757 (SHOEI CHEMICAL IND CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-3* paragraphs [0027], [0029], examples, claims, figures *; | [X]EP3057110 (TODA KOGYO CORP [JP]) [X] 1-3 * para.[0027],[0029]; claim 2, examples, tables 1 & 2 *; | [XA] - KIM KYUMIN ET AL, "Effects of Calcination Conditions on Magnetic Properties in Strontium Ferrite Synthesized by the Molten Salt Method", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON MAGNETICS, IEEE SERVICE CENTER, NEW YORK, NY, US, vol. 52, no. 7, doi:10.1109/TMAG.2016.2531119, ISSN 0018-9464, (20160701), pages 1 - 4, (20160623), XP011615052 [X] 1 * II. Experimental; figs. 2(a) & 4(a) and the discussion of said figures on the same page * [A] 2,3 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TMAG.2016.2531119 | [XA] - KAZIN ET AL, "Formation of submicron-sized SrFe"1"2"-"xAl"xO"1"9 with very high coercivity", JOURNAL OF MAGNETISM AND MAGNETIC MATERIALS, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20071030), vol. 320, no. 6, ISSN 0304-8853, pages 1068 - 1072, XP022487452 [X] 1 * 2. Experimental & figures 4(a), 4(b) and 5 * [A] 2,3 | International search | [A]JPS5574107 (DORNIER SYSTEM GMBH) [A] 1-3 * , claims, page 4, column 11, lines 10-16, page 5, column 15, line 19, column 16, line 2, examples 1, 2, fig. 1-3 & US 4336242 A:claims, column 2, lines 43-50, column 4, lines 8-12, examples 1-2, fig. 1-3 & EP 11265 A2 & DE 2850108 A1 *; | [A]JPS621149 (TOSHIBA CORP) [A] 1-3* , entire text (Family: none) *; | [A]US4765920 (GATTUSO TODD R [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * , column 2, lines 30-35, column 6, lines 60-67, examples 1-3, fig. 1-2 (Family: none) *; | [A]JPH05258932 (SHOWA DENKO KABUSHIKI KAISHA) [A] 1-3 * , entire text (Family: none) *; | [XY]JPH0948618 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO) [X] 1 * , claims, paragraphs [0001], [0012], [0043], [0045], [0055], [0056], fig. 2 & US 5736111 A: claims, fig. 2, column 1, lines 5-15, column 3, lines 18-28, column 7, lines 19-25, column 7, lines 41-47, example 1 & DE 19630756 A1 * [Y] 2,3; | [A]JP2002025816 (SHOEI CHEMICAL IND CO, et al) [A] 1-3 * , claims, paragraphs [0002], [0012]-[0016], examples, fig. 1, 7, 12 & US 2002/0017628 A1:claims, examples, fig. 1, 7, 12, paragraphs [0004], [0030]-[0035] & EP 1170757 A2 & DE 60105898 T2 & CA 2352545 A1 & KR 10-2002-0005469 A & CN 1335283 A & TW 584870 B & SG 101986 A1 & MY 127611 A *; | [A]JP2003104790 (TDK CORP) [A] 1-3 * , claims, paragraph [0029], example 4, fig. 1, 7 & US 2002/0197461 A1:claims, paragraph [0064], "embodiment example 4", fig. 1, 7 & JP 2003-313093 A & EP 1262450 A1 & CA 2387677 A1 & KR 10-2002-0091780 A & CN 1389433 A & TW 1291936 B *; | [YA]WO2016136701 (DOWA ELECTRONICS MATERIALS CO [JP], et al) [Y] 2,3 * , claims, paragraphs [0009], [0024], [0026], [0041], [0055], fig. 1 & EP 3264430 A1: claims, paragraphs [0015], [0039], [0042], [0067], [0095], [0096], fig. 1 & JP 2016-157939 A & CN 107004479 A & KR 10-2017-0121226 A * [A] 1 | by applicant | JP2013211316 | JP2016139451 | JP2017073209 |