Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3682288 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | C0 | EP3682288 | Global Dossier | 07.06.2023 | B1 | EP3682288 | 22.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP74902 | 14.09.2018 | AT507762017 | 15.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2019053198 | Global Dossier | 21.03.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT507762017 | 15.09.2017 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AT520498B | 15.02.2021 | B1 | AT520498 | 15.04.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | AT507762017 | 15.09.2017 |