Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
29.03.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | |
22.12.2023 | Change or deletion: representative for unitary effect | published on 24.01.2024 [2024/04] |
14.07.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect | published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
07.07.2023 | Filing of request for unitary effect | published on 09.08.2023 [2023/32] |