EP3682288 - OPTICAL COMPONENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Unitary effect registered Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for unitary effect filed Status updated on 07.07.2023 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Payment of renewal fee | Proprietor(s) | For all participating member states Viewpoint Sicherheitsforschung - Blickforschung GmbH Am Heumarkt 10, Top 5 1030 Wien / AT | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BLATT, Jan Mariahilferstraße 172/149 1150 Wien / AT | 02 /
KOZA, Martin Magdalenenstraße 23/19 1060 Wien / AT | 03 /
LINSENMAIER, Frank Schurwaldstraße 12 71384 Weinstadt / DE | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Schardmüller Gall-Schuhmann Patentanwälte OG Garnisongasse 1/22a 1090 Wien / AT | [2024/04] |
Former [2023/33] | Gibler & Poth Patentanwälte KG Dorotheergasse 7/14 1010 Wien / AT | Application number, filing date | 18778395.6 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018EP74902 | Procedural language | DE | (Principal) place of business Tooltip on the date of filing | Principal place of businessTooltip | Unitary Patent Protection | 06.07.2023 | Date of request for unitary effect [2023/32] | 18.07.2023 | Decision on the request for unitary effect: Positive [2023/33] | 18.07.2023 | Date of registration [2023/33] | 07.06.2023 | Date of legal effect [2023/33] | Member States covered by Unitary Tooltip Patent Protection | 18.07.2023 | AT, BE, BG, DE, DK, EE, FI, FR, IT, LT, LU, LV, MT, NL, PT, SE, SI [2023/33] | Publication | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3682288 | Date: | 07.06.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/23] | Renewal fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.03.2024 | Renewal fee unitary effect year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee 06 | 30.09.2023 | M06 Fee paid on 27.03.2024 |