EP3681420 - POWERED INTRAOSSEOUS DRIVER WITH PROTECTIVE MEMBER, AND RELATED KITS AND COMPONENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/30] | POWERED INTRAOSSEOUS DRIVER WITH PROTECTIVE MEMBER, AND RELATED KITS, COMPONENTS, AND METHODS | ||
[2023/12] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE, IT, SI | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Teleflex Life Sciences Limited 171, Old Bakery Street Valletta, VLT 1455 / MT | [2023/32] |
Former [2023/17] | For all designated states Teleflex Medical Devices S.à.r.l. 26, Boulevard de Kockelscheuer 1821 Luxembourg / LU | ||
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states Teleflex Medical Devices S.à.r.l. 560A Rue de Neudorf 2220 Luxembourg / LU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAYNE, Joanne 40 Bastion Quay Athlone Co Westmeath N37 YW21 / IE | 02 /
MORGAN, John 26735 Sagitarius Lane San Antonio, Texas 78260 / US | 03 /
SKELTON, Eugene 31 Shrewsbury Lawn Cabinteely Dublin Co. Dublin 18 / IE | 04 /
WRIGHT, Anthony 16 Ashcroft Abbeyside Dungarvan Co. Waterford / IE | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Simmons & Simmons City Point One Ropemaker Street London EC2Y 9SS / GB | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18779048.0 | 10.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018IB56893 | Priority number, date | US201762556953P | 11.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556953 P | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019049098 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681420 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3681420 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/34, A61B90/00 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
A61B17/3472 (EP,US);
A61B17/3476 (EP,US);
A61B17/3494 (EP,US);
A61B2010/0258 (US);
A61B2017/00734 (EP);
A61B2090/037 (EP);
A61B2090/0814 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | MOTORISCH ANGETRIEBENER INTRAOSSÄRER BOHRER MIT SCHUTZELEMENT, UND ZUGEHÖRIGE KITS UND KOMPONENTEN | [2023/12] | English: | POWERED INTRAOSSEOUS DRIVER WITH PROTECTIVE MEMBER, AND RELATED KITS AND COMPONENTS | [2023/12] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT INTRA-OSSEUX ALIMENTÉ DOTÉ D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE PROTECTION, ET KITS ET COMPOSANTS | [2023/12] |
Former [2020/30] | MOTORISCH ANGETRIEBENER INTRAOSSÄRER BOHRER MIT SCHUTZELEMENT UND ZUGEHÖRIGE KITS, KOMPONENTEN UND VERFAHREN | ||
Former [2020/30] | POWERED INTRAOSSEOUS DRIVER WITH PROTECTIVE MEMBER, AND RELATED KITS, COMPONENTS, AND METHODS | ||
Former [2020/30] | DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAÎNEMENT INTRA-OSSEUX ALIMENTÉ DOTÉ D'UN ÉLÉMENT DE PROTECTION, ET KITS, COMPOSANTS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 12.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.03.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.07.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 11.07.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.07.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23187318.3 / EP4238525 | Opposition(s) | 17.05.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.08.2023 | CZ | 16.08.2023 | DK | 16.08.2023 | EE | 16.08.2023 | ES | 16.08.2023 | FI | 16.08.2023 | HR | 16.08.2023 | IT | 16.08.2023 | LT | 16.08.2023 | LV | 16.08.2023 | MC | 16.08.2023 | NL | 16.08.2023 | PL | 16.08.2023 | RO | 16.08.2023 | RS | 16.08.2023 | SE | 16.08.2023 | SI | 16.08.2023 | SK | 16.08.2023 | SM | 16.08.2023 | IE | 10.09.2023 | LU | 10.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | CH | 30.09.2023 | NO | 16.11.2023 | GR | 17.11.2023 | IS | 16.12.2023 | PT | 18.12.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/34] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 10.09.2023 | ||
LU | 10.09.2023 | ||
CH | 30.09.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/33] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
IE | 10.09.2023 | ||
LU | 10.09.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
MC | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 10.09.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
LU | 10.09.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
EE | 16.08.2023 | ||
ES | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SK | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/22] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
CZ | 16.08.2023 | ||
DK | 16.08.2023 | ||
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RO | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
SM | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
HR | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
LV | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
PL | 16.08.2023 | ||
RS | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
PT | 18.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AT | 16.08.2023 | |
FI | 16.08.2023 | ||
LT | 16.08.2023 | ||
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
SE | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | ||
IS | 16.12.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | LT | 16.08.2023 | |
NL | 16.08.2023 | ||
NO | 16.11.2023 | ||
GR | 17.11.2023 | Cited in | International search | [A]US6273715 (MELLER MOSHE [IL], et al) [A] 1-30 * figures 2, 3, 6, 7 ** column 5, line 44 - line 53 *; | [A]EP1346739 (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-30 * figures 1, 3, 4 * * paragraph [0038] - paragraph [0042] *; | [A]US9027254 (VODINH HIEN [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document *; | [A]US2015190165 (VODINH HIEN [US]) [A] 1-30 * figures 13-15 * * paragraphs [0035] , [0 62] , [0 63] *; | [A]EP3107692 (VIDACARE LLC [US]) [A] 1-30 * the whole document * |