EP3678715 - CALENDERED SURGICAL MESHES COMPRISING POLYHYDROXYALKANOATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 03.05.2024 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 08.01.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.07.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tepha, Inc. 99 Hayden Avenue Lexington, MA 02421 / US | [2020/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RIZK, Said 72 Heritage Hill Windham, New Jersey 03087 / US | 02 /
SHAH, Bhavin 353 Pawtucket Blvd. Unit 12 Lowell, Massachusetts 01854 / US | 03 /
MARTIN, David P. 33 Hemlock Street Arlington, Massachusetts 02474 / US | 04 /
WILLIAMS, Simon F. 23 Orrin Street Cambridge, Massachusetts 02138 / US | [2020/29] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2020/29] | Potter Clarkson The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | Application number, filing date | 18779125.6 | 05.09.2018 | [2020/29] | WO2018US49530 | Priority number, date | US201762554673P | 06.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762554673 P | [2020/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019050936 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3678715 | Date: | 15.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61L27/18, A61L27/54, C08L67/04, C08G63/06, D01D10/00, D01F6/62, A61F2/00 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
A61L27/18 (EP,US);
A61F2/0063 (US);
A61L27/54 (EP,US);
C08G63/06 (EP,US);
D01F6/625 (EP,US);
A61F2002/0068 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2020/29] | A61L27/18, A61L27/54, C08L67/04, A61F2/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/29] | Title | German: | KALANDRIERTE CHIRURGISCHE NETZE MIT POLYHYDROXYALKANOATEN | [2020/29] | English: | CALENDERED SURGICAL MESHES COMPRISING POLYHYDROXYALKANOATES | [2020/29] | French: | TREILLIS CHIRURGICAUX CALANDRÉS COMPRENANT DES POLYHYDROXYALCANOATES | [2020/29] | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.07.2019 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 30.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/29] | 30.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.05.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 03.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US9457127 (MARTIN DAVID P [US], et al) [X] 1-12,15-19 * column 2, line 40 - line 44 * * column 3, line 13 - line 18 * * column 4, lines 35, 36 * * column 8, lines 20, 33-36 * * column 9, lines 17-19 * * column 10, lines 8, 9 *[I] 13,14 | by applicant | US5811272 | WO9932536 | WO0056376 | US6245537 | US6316262 | US6323010 | US6548569 | US6555123 | US6585994 | US6610764 | US6623748 | US6828357 | US6838493 | US6867247 | US6867248 | US6878758 | US7025980 | US7179883 | US7244442 | WO2007092417 | US7268205 | US7553923 | US7618448 | US7641825 | US8016883 | WO2011119742 | US8034270 | US8039237 | WO2012064526 | US8231889 | US8287909 | US8747468 | US2015313700 | US9532867 | US9555155 | - MARTIN et al., J. Surg. Res., (20130000), vol. 184, pages 766 - 773 | - STEINBIICHEL A. et al., "Diversity of Bacterial Polyhydroxyalkanoic Acids", FEMS Microbial. Lett., (19950000), vol. 128, pages 219 - 228 | - HORI et al., Polymer, (19950000), vol. 36, pages 4703 - 4705 | - HOUK et al., J. Org. Chem., (20080000), vol. 73, no. 7, pages 2674 - 2678 | - MOORE et al., Biomaterials, (20050000), vol. 26, pages 3771 - 3782 | - WILLIAMS, S.F. et al., Polyesters, III, (20020000), vol. 4, pages 91 - 127 | - MARTIN, D. et al., "Medical Applications of Poly-4-hydroxybutyrate: A Strong Flexible Absorbable Biomaterial", Biochem. Eng. J., (20030000), vol. 16, pages 97 - 105 | - WILLIAMS, S. et al., "Poly-4- hydroxybutyrate (P4HB): a new generation of resorbable medical devices for tissue repair and regeneration", Biomed. Tech. (Berl), (20130000), ISSN 1862-278X, ISSN |