EP3682577 - TECHNIQUES AND APPARATUSES FOR HARQ-ACK TIMELINE INDICATION AND HARQ-ACK MULTIPLEXING AND BUNDLING IN NEW RADIO [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.02.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 18.03.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.11.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 16.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Yang 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 02 /
CHEN, Wanshi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 03 /
MONTOJO, Juan 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 04 /
SADIQ, Bilal 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 05 /
WANG, Renqiu 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 06 /
LEE, Heechoon 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | 07 /
HUANG, Yi 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego California 92121 / US | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | [2022/16] |
Former [2020/30] | Heselberger, Johannes Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte Prinzregentenplatz 7 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18779163.7 | 10.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018US50278 | Priority number, date | US201762556800P | 11.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762556800 P | US201816125222 | 07.09.2018 Original published format: US201816125222 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019051418 | Date: | 14.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3682577 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3682577 | Date: | 20.04.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
H04L1/1861 (EP,US);
H04L5/0055 (EP,US);
H04L1/1614 (US);
H04L1/1657 (US);
H04L1/1812 (US);
H04L1/1854 (EP,US);
H04L5/0053 (EP,US);
H04W72/23 (US);
H04W76/28 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN FÜR HARQ-ACK-ZEITLINIENANZEIGE UND HARQ-ACK-MULTIPLEXING UND -BÜNDELUNG IN NEW RADIO | [2020/30] | English: | TECHNIQUES AND APPARATUSES FOR HARQ-ACK TIMELINE INDICATION AND HARQ-ACK MULTIPLEXING AND BUNDLING IN NEW RADIO | [2020/30] | French: | TECHNIQUES ET APPAREILS POUR INDICATION DE CHRONOLOGIE HARQ-ACK ET MULTIPLEXAGE HARQ-ACK ET GROUPAGE EN NEW RADIO | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 06.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.11.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.03.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 11.03.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 11.03.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 23.01.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2018 | AL | 20.04.2022 | AT | 20.04.2022 | CY | 20.04.2022 | CZ | 20.04.2022 | DK | 20.04.2022 | EE | 20.04.2022 | ES | 20.04.2022 | FI | 20.04.2022 | HR | 20.04.2022 | IT | 20.04.2022 | LT | 20.04.2022 | LV | 20.04.2022 | MC | 20.04.2022 | MK | 20.04.2022 | MT | 20.04.2022 | NL | 20.04.2022 | PL | 20.04.2022 | RO | 20.04.2022 | RS | 20.04.2022 | SE | 20.04.2022 | SI | 20.04.2022 | SK | 20.04.2022 | SM | 20.04.2022 | TR | 20.04.2022 | BG | 20.07.2022 | NO | 20.07.2022 | GR | 21.07.2022 | IS | 20.08.2022 | PT | 22.08.2022 | IE | 10.09.2022 | LU | 10.09.2022 | BE | 30.09.2022 | CH | 30.09.2022 | LI | 30.09.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/29] | HU | 10.09.2018 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
TR | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 10.09.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 10.09.2018 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
MK | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 10.09.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 10.09.2018 | |
AL | 20.04.2022 | ||
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 10.09.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CY | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 10.09.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2024/11] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
IT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 10.09.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/42] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 10.09.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
BE | 30.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/35] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 10.09.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
CH | 30.09.2022 | ||
LI | 30.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/33] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
IE | 10.09.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
LU | 10.09.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SI | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
MC | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/17] | AL | 20.04.2022 | |
AT | 20.04.2022 | ||
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
CZ | 20.04.2022 | ||
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
EE | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RO | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
SK | 20.04.2022 | ||
SM | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/07] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
DK | 20.04.2022 | ||
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/51] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
IS | 20.08.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/50] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
PL | 20.04.2022 | ||
RS | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
HR | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
LV | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
BG | 20.07.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
GR | 21.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/47] | AT | 20.04.2022 | |
ES | 20.04.2022 | ||
FI | 20.04.2022 | ||
LT | 20.04.2022 | ||
NL | 20.04.2022 | ||
SE | 20.04.2022 | ||
NO | 20.07.2022 | ||
PT | 22.08.2022 | ||
Former [2022/44] | NL | 20.04.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XA]US2012039279 (CHEN WANSHI [US], et al) [X] 4,9,17,21 * paragraph [0066] - paragraph [0094] * * paragraph [0113] * * paragraph [0126] - paragraph [0138] *[A] 1,13; | [XAY]US2012106569 (CHE XIANG GUANG [CN], et al) [X] 5-9,17-21 * paragraph [0036] - paragraph [0049] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0065] * * paragraph [0071] - paragraph [0105] * [A] 1,13 [Y] 2,14; | [XY]US2015146643 (FU JINGXING [CN], et al) [X] 1,3-5,9-13,15-17,21-24 * paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0012] * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0033] * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0073] * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0107] * * paragraph [0133] - paragraph [0134] * * paragraph [0143] * * paragraph [0148] - paragraph [0150] * [Y] 2,14 |