EP3687570 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ELICITING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE AGAINST CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 31.03.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2023 | New entry: Decision on request for further processing | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 66 Hudson Boulevard East New York, NY 10001-2192 / US | [2023/14] |
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states Pfizer Inc. 235 East 42nd Street New York, NY 10017 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Annaliesa Sybil 49 Hillcrest Drive Upper Saddle River, New Jersey 07458 / US | 02 /
DONALD, Robert G.K. 129 Kenneth Terrace South Orange, New Jersey 07079 / US | 03 /
FLINT, Michael James 220 Spring Street Decatur, Georgia 30030 / US | 04 /
JANSEN, Kathrin Ute 160 East 65th Street New York, New York 10065 / US | 05 /
KITCHIN, Nicholas Randolph Everard c/o Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | 06 /
MORAN, Justin Keith 26 Wheeler Place West Nyack, New York 10994 / US | 07 /
PEDNEAULT, Louise 530 East 72nd Street New York, New York 10021 / US | 08 /
PRIDE, Michael W. 80 Bay Street Landing Unit 8A Staten Island, New York 10301 / US | 09 /
RUPPEN, Mark Edward 6 Lea Court Garnerville, New York 10923 / US | 10 /
WEBBER, Christopher Frederick c/o Ramsgate Road Sandwich Kent CT13 9NJ / GB | [2020/32] | Representative(s) | Pfizer European Patent Department 23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue 75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR | [2020/32] | Application number, filing date | 18779805.3 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018IB57076 | Priority number, date | US201762565096P | 28.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762565096 P | US201762576603P | 24.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762576603 P | US201762577661P | 26.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762577661 P | US201862720617P | 21.08.2018 Original published format: US 201862720617 P | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019064115 | Date: | 04.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/14] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3687570 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 04.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K39/08, C07K16/12, C07K14/33, A61K39/00 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
A61K39/08 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K9/19 (US);
A61P31/04 (KR);
C07K14/33 (EP,IL,KR);
C07K16/1282 (EP,IL,KR);
A61K2039/545 (EP,IL,KR,US);
C07K2317/76 (EP,IL,KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR AUSLÖSUNG EINER IMMUNREAKTION GEGEN CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE | [2020/32] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR ELICITING AN IMMUNE RESPONSE AGAINST CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE | [2020/32] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE GÉNÉRATION D'UNE RÉPONSE IMMUNITAIRE À CLOSTRIDIUM DIFFICILE | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.03.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 28.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.04.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 04.12.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 04.12.2023 | Request for further processing filed | 04.12.2023 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 13.12.2023 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9920304 (ORAVAX INC [US]); | [A]EP1568378 (ACAMBIS INC [US]); | [A]US2012269841 (SIDHU MANINDER K [US], et al); | [A]WO2014060898 (PFIZER [US]); | [I]WO2014201346 (SANOFI PASTEUR INC [US]); | by applicant | GB2220211 | WO9840100 | WO0062800 | WO2010067262 | WO2012143902 | WO2014060898 | US9187536 |