EP3681739 - DEVICE FOR EVALUATING THE FIRMNESS OF A GROUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 24.09.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.04.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Générale des Etablissements Michelin 23 place des Carmes-Déchaux 63000 Clermont-Ferrand / FR | [2020/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BEGOU, Pierre-Alain MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 02 /
PATURLE, Antoine MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 03 /
VACHERAND, Jean-Michel MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | 04 /
BOUHADIDA, Oussama MANUFACTURE FRANCAISE DES PNEUMATIQUES MICHELIN CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | Roussy, Delphine Manufacture Française des Pneumatiques Michelin CBS/CORP/J/PI - F35 - Ladoux 23, place des Carmes-Déchaux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 9 / FR | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18780192.3 | 14.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018FR52257 | Priority number, date | FR20170058531 | 14.09.2017 Original published format: FR 1758531 | [2020/30] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019053384 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | FR | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681739 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3681739 | Date: | 27.10.2021 | Language: | FR | [2021/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B60C19/00, B60C23/06, B60W40/06, B60T8/172 | [2021/15] | CPC: |
B60C23/064 (EP,EA,US);
B60T8/1725 (EP,EA);
B60W40/06 (EP,EA);
B60C2019/004 (EP,EA,US);
B60T2210/10 (EP,EA);
B60W2530/20 (EP,EA);
B60W2552/00 (EP,EA)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/30] | B60C23/06, B60T8/172, B60W40/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEWERTUNG DER FESTIGKEIT EINES BODENS | [2020/30] | English: | DEVICE FOR EVALUATING THE FIRMNESS OF A GROUND | [2020/30] | French: | METHODE D'EVALUATION DE LA FERMETE D'UN SOL | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 14.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 14.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.04.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 28.07.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 14.09.2018 | AL | 27.10.2021 | AT | 27.10.2021 | CY | 27.10.2021 | CZ | 27.10.2021 | DK | 27.10.2021 | EE | 27.10.2021 | ES | 27.10.2021 | FI | 27.10.2021 | HR | 27.10.2021 | IT | 27.10.2021 | LT | 27.10.2021 | LV | 27.10.2021 | MC | 27.10.2021 | MK | 27.10.2021 | NL | 27.10.2021 | PL | 27.10.2021 | RO | 27.10.2021 | RS | 27.10.2021 | SE | 27.10.2021 | SI | 27.10.2021 | SK | 27.10.2021 | SM | 27.10.2021 | TR | 27.10.2021 | BG | 27.01.2022 | NO | 27.01.2022 | GR | 28.01.2022 | IS | 27.02.2022 | PT | 28.02.2022 | [2024/29] |
Former [2024/27] | HU | 14.09.2018 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
MK | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 14.09.2018 | |
AL | 27.10.2021 | ||
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CY | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/27] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
IT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
MC | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2023/01] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SI | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/49] | AL | 27.10.2021 | |
AT | 27.10.2021 | ||
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
CZ | 27.10.2021 | ||
DK | 27.10.2021 | ||
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SK | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
EE | 27.10.2021 | ||
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RO | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/33] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
SM | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
NO | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/24] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
NL | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
SE | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
GR | 28.01.2022 | ||
IS | 27.02.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
ES | 27.10.2021 | ||
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
HR | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
LV | 27.10.2021 | ||
PL | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
PT | 28.02.2022 | ||
Former [2022/22] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
FI | 27.10.2021 | ||
LT | 27.10.2021 | ||
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/21] | AT | 27.10.2021 | |
RS | 27.10.2021 | ||
BG | 27.01.2022 | ||
Former [2022/19] | BG | 27.01.2022 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0887211 (MICHELIN & CIE [FR]) [A] 1-15* column 2, line 49 - column 5, line 15; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2003154007 (EVANS JIM [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0024] - paragraph [0044]; figures 1-6 * | by applicant | EP1820670 | EP3031632 |