EP3606479 - DELIVERY SYSTEMS FOR STENTS HAVING PROTRUDING FEATURES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.07.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Reflow Medical, Inc. 1003 Calle Sombra San Clemente, CA 92673 / US | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JIMENEZ, Teodoro S. 1003 Calle Sombra San Clemente California 92673 / US | 02 /
FULKERSON, John 1003 Calle Sombra San Clemente California 92673 / US | 03 /
RIZK, Isa 1003 Calle Sombra San Clemente California 92673 / US | 04 /
MUSTAPHA, Jihad Ali 1003 Calle Sombra San Clemente California 92673 / US | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Epping - Hermann - Fischer Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloßschmidstraße 5 80639 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18780456.2 | 06.04.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018US26581 | Priority number, date | US201762482600P | 06.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762482600 P | [2020/07] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018187761 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3606479 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/07] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/966, A61F2/958, A61F2/848, A61K47/69 | [2020/07] | CPC: |
A61F2/966 (EP,US);
A61F2/92 (US);
A61F2/848 (EP,US);
A61F2/90 (EP,US);
A61L31/16 (US);
A61F2/958 (EP,US);
A61F2002/8483 (US);
A61F2002/9528 (EP,US);
A61F2002/9534 (EP,US);
A61F2220/0016 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0067 (EP,US);
A61F2250/0098 (EP,US);
A61L2300/416 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Title | German: | EINFÜHRSYSTEME FÜR STENTS MIT VORSTEHENDEN MERKMALEN | [2020/07] | English: | DELIVERY SYSTEMS FOR STENTS HAVING PROTRUDING FEATURES | [2020/07] | French: | SYSTÈMES D'ADMINISTRATION POUR ENDOPROTHÈSES AYANT DES ÉLÉMENTS SAILLANTS | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 14.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 14.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 20.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.06.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2020 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   09.10.2020 | 30.04.2021 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   29.06.2021 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]EP0701800 (BARD INC C R [US]); | [X]US5639274 (FISCHELL ROBERT E [US], et al); | [Y]US5843167 (DWYER CLIFFORD J [US], et al); | [Y]US6113579 (EIDENSCHINK TRACEE E J [US], et al); | [Y]US2003125751 (GRIFFIN PATRICK [IE], et al); | [Y]US2007043419 (NIKOLCHEV JULIAN [US], et al); | [XY]US2008109065 (BOWE JASON S [US]); | [XY]US2017056154 (GREENBERG ROY K [US], et al) | International search | [XYA]US6613075 (HEALY STEPHEN R [US], et al); | [Y]US8128687 (RAO K T VENKATESWARA [US]); | [A]US8128676 (CUMMINGS CHARLES [US]); | [A]US8758420 (DORN JURGEN [DE], et al); | [A]US8926683 (GILL DARLA [US], et al) | by applicant | EP0701800 | US5639274 | US5843167 | US6113579 | US2003125751 | US2007043419 | US2008109065 | US2017056154 |