Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11110560 | Global Dossier | 07.09.2021 | B2 | US2020230757 | 23.07.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017075592 | 05.04.2017 | WO2018JP09953 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR102158175B | Global Dossier | 22.09.2020 | B1 | KR20190109462 | 25.09.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017075592 | 05.04.2017 | WO2018JP09953 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6749033B | Global Dossier | 02.09.2020 | B2 | JPWO2018186136 | 14.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017075592 | 05.04.2017 | WO2018JP09953 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN110418693B | Global Dossier | 06.04.2021 | B | CN110418693 | 05.11.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | JP2017075592 | 05.04.2017 | WO2018JP09953 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3563970 | Global Dossier | 14.07.2021 | B1 | EP3563970 | 04.11.2020 | A4 | EP3563970 | 06.11.2019 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017075592 | 05.04.2017 | WO2018JP09953 | 14.03.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018186136 | Global Dossier | 11.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2017075592 | 05.04.2017 |