EP3608353 - POLYPROPYLENE FILM, POLYPROPYLENE FILM WITH INTEGRATED METAL LAYER, AND FILM CAPACITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 19.01.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 14.07.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oji Holdings Corporation 7-5, Ginza 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2020/07] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISHIDA, Tatsuji c/o OJI HOLDINGS CORPORATION 7-5 Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 02 /
TOMINAGA, Takeshi c/o OJI HOLDINGS CORPORATION 7-5 Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 03 /
NAKATA, Masahiro c/o OJI HOLDINGS CORPORATION 7-5 Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | 04 /
ISHIWATA, Tadakazu c/o OJI HOLDINGS CORPORATION 7-5 Ginza 4-chome, Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | [2023/49] |
Former [2020/07] | 01 /
ISHIDA, Tatsuji c/o OJI HOLDINGS CORPORATION 7-5 Ginza 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | ||
02 /
TOMINAGA, Takeshi c/o OJI HOLDINGS CORPORATION 7-5 Ginza 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | |||
03 /
NAKATA, Masahiro c/o OJI HOLDINGS CORPORATION 7-5 Ginza 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | |||
04 /
ISHIWATA, Tadakazu c/o OJI HOLDINGS CORPORATION 7-5 Ginza 4-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0061 / JP | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18781449.6 | 03.04.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018JP14342 | Priority number, date | JP20170073748 | 03.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017073748 | JP20180070358 | 30.03.2018 Original published format: JP 2018070358 | [2020/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018186424 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608353 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3608353 | Date: | 21.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C08J5/18, B32B15/085, H01G4/32, C08L23/12, H01G4/18 | [2020/51] | CPC: |
H01G4/18 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP,KR);
B32B15/085 (KR);
C08L23/12 (EP);
H01G4/32 (EP,KR);
C08J2323/10 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L23/12, C08L23/12 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | C08J5/18, B32B15/085, H01G4/32 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | POLYPROPYLENFOLIE, POLYPROPYLENFOLIE MIT INTEGRIERTER METALLSCHICHT UND FOLIENKONDENSATOR | [2020/07] | English: | POLYPROPYLENE FILM, POLYPROPYLENE FILM WITH INTEGRATED METAL LAYER, AND FILM CAPACITOR | [2020/07] | French: | FILM DE POLYPROPYLÈNE, FILM DE POLYPROPYLÈNE AVEC COUCHE MÉTALLIQUE INTÉGRÉE, ET CONDENSATEUR À FILM | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 15.10.2019 | Translation filed | 17.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 17.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 09.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.01.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 11.01.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 11.01.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 06.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 17.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.02.2024 | BG | 21.02.2024 | ES | 21.02.2024 | FI | 21.02.2024 | HR | 21.02.2024 | LT | 21.02.2024 | LV | 21.02.2024 | NL | 21.02.2024 | PL | 21.02.2024 | SE | 21.02.2024 | NO | 21.05.2024 | RS | 21.05.2024 | GR | 22.05.2024 | IS | 21.06.2024 | PT | 21.06.2024 | [2024/37] |
Former [2024/36] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
LV | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
PL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
PT | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/35] | AT | 21.02.2024 | |
BG | 21.02.2024 | ||
ES | 21.02.2024 | ||
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/34] | BG | 21.02.2024 | |
FI | 21.02.2024 | ||
HR | 21.02.2024 | ||
LT | 21.02.2024 | ||
NL | 21.02.2024 | ||
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
RS | 21.05.2024 | ||
GR | 22.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | LT | 21.02.2024 | |
NO | 21.05.2024 | ||
IS | 21.06.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | IS | 21.06.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP1990353 (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI]) [A] 1-8 * paragraphs [0003] - [0020]; claim - *; | [I]WO2016159330 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [I] 1-8; | [I]EP3127945 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [I] 1-8 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0034] , [0035] , [0038] , [0039] , [0043] , [0074] - [0082]; example -; claims 1-6 *; | [IP]EP3279908 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [IP] 1-8 * paragraphs [0012] , [0043] , [0044] , [0063] - [0072]; claims 9-13 *; | [E]US2020176188 (SUEYOSHI MICHIKO [JP], et al) [E] 1-8* paragraphs [0075] - [0079]; claims 1,3,4,6,7 * | International search | [XY]JPS59211908 (TOSHIBA KK) [X] 1, 3, 6-7 * , * [Y] 4-5; | [A]JPH09148176 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-7* , *; | [A]WO2013105552 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [XY]JP2014051657 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1-7 * , * [Y] 4-5; | [XY]JP2016012705 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP) [X] 1-7 * , * [Y] 4-5; | [A]WO2016017752 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , & *; | [A]JP2016033211 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [XY]WO2016051496 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [X] 1-7 * , * [Y] 4-5; | [A]WO2016167328 (OJI HOLDINGS CORP [JP]) [A] 1-7 * , * | by applicant | JPS6238403B | JP3689009B | JP2010280795 | JP6089186B | - FUMIYUKIHAMADA, High Polymers, Kobunshi, (19670000), vol. 16, pages 694 - 706 |