EP3608376 - INK COMPOSITION, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND IMAGE FORMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 01.05.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2024/37] |
Former [2021/14] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | ||
Former [2020/07] | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KOYAMA, Ichiro c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Noriaki c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | 03 /
SUZUKI, Shota c/o FUJIFILM Corporation 577 Ushijima Kaisei-machi Ashigarakami-gun Kanagawa 258-8577 / JP | [2020/07] | Representative(s) | Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2020/07] | Application number, filing date | 18781734.1 | 26.03.2018 | [2020/07] | WO2018JP12227 | Priority number, date | JP20170074057 | 03.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017074057 | [2020/07] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018186225 | Date: | 11.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/41] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3608376 | Date: | 12.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3608376 | Date: | 11.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/37] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.03.2020 | Classification | IPC: | C09D11/38, B41M5/00, C09D11/102 | [2020/16] | CPC: |
C09D11/38 (EP,US);
B41M5/00 (EP);
B41M5/0023 (US);
C09D11/102 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2020/07] | C09D11/38, B41M5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/07] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | TINTENZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND BILDERZEUGUNGSVERFAHREN | [2020/07] | English: | INK COMPOSITION, PRODUCTION METHOD THEREFOR, AND IMAGE FORMATION METHOD | [2020/07] | French: | COMPOSITION D'ENCRE, SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION ET PROCÉDÉ DE FORMATION D'IMAGE | [2020/07] | Entry into regional phase | 30.09.2019 | Translation filed | 30.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 30.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.2019 | Examination requested [2020/07] | 07.08.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.06.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.10.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 28.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.08.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 06.08.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 06.08.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2016200938 (BERGER SEBASTIAN [US], et al); | [X]CN106221346 (WUHAN INST TECHNOLOGY); | [XI]JP2017008292 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD) | International search | [X]JP2010518249 ; | [Y]JP2011530634 ; | [A]JP2013193324 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2015048435 (FUJIFILM CORP); | [A]JP2015124271 (RICOH CO LTD); | [A]JP2015529731 ; | [Y]JP2017008292 (SANYO CHEMICAL IND LTD); | [PA]JP2017119862 (PILOT CORP) | by applicant | JPS473981B | JPS476416B | JPS4722326B | JPS4723664B | JPS5730704 | JPS579053B | US4318791 | JPS5942864B | JPS6026483B | JPS6026403B | JPS60132767 | JPS61194062 | JPS6281345 | JPS62135826 | JPS62173463 | JPS62183457 | EP0284561 | JPS6361950B | JPS6434242 | JPH029597B | JPH029596B | JPH02211452 | JPH06107718 | JPH0731399B | JPH07159983 | JPH08224982 | JPH09134011 | JPH10863 | JP2002309217 | JP2004514014 | JP2005213463 | JP2007197732 | JP2008105379 | JP2008239890 | JP2009114290 | JP2010024276 | JP2013018860 | JP2014040529 | JP5591858B | JP2015174943 | WO2015158654 | WO2015158592 | WO2016052053 | JP2017074057 |