EP3692012 - METHOD FOR RECOVERING VALUABLE SUBSTANCES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.09.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.09.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 23.04.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 15.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DENKGRÜN Energie und Ressourcen GmbH Rennweg 87 2345 Brunn am Gebirge / AT | [2024/21] |
Former [2021/16] | For all designated states DENKGRÜN Energie und Ressourcen GmbH Mölkerbastei 3/2A 1010 Wien / AT | ||
Former [2020/47] | For all designated states Pro aqua Diamantelektroden Produktion GmbH Parkring 1 8712 Niklasdorf / AT | ||
Former [2020/33] | For all designated states Schelch, Michael Paulahofsiedlung 28 8600 Oberaich / AT | ||
For all designated states Staber, Wolfgang Siedlung Westend 4 8600 Bruck an der Mur / AT | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schelch, Michael Paulahofsiedlung 28 8600 Oberaich / AT | 02 /
Staber, Wolfgang Siedlung Westend 4 8600 Bruck an der Mur / AT | [2020/47] |
Former [2020/33] | 01 /
see applicant ... | Representative(s) | Vinazzer, Edith Vinazzer European Patent Attorneys Karl-Rudolf-Werner-Gasse 60 3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | [2023/44] |
Former [2020/33] | Vinazzer, Edith Hölzlgasse 64-68/1 3400 Klosterneuburg / AT | Application number, filing date | 18781999.0 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/33] | WO2018EP76020 | Priority number, date | AT20170050842 | 03.10.2017 Original published format: AT 508422017 | [2020/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019068524 | Date: | 11.04.2019 | Language: | DE | [2019/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3692012 | Date: | 12.08.2020 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/33] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3692012 | Date: | 01.11.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/44] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 11.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | C05F1/00, C05F3/00, C05F5/00, C05F7/00, C05F9/04, C02F11/00 | [2020/33] | CPC: |
C02F11/006 (EP,US);
C05F1/00 (AT);
C05C3/00 (US);
B01D11/028 (US);
C02F1/20 (US);
C02F1/46 (US);
C02F1/469 (US);
C02F1/66 (US);
C02F1/68 (US);
C02F11/18 (US);
C02F9/00 (US);
C05F1/005 (EP,US);
C05F1/007 (US);
C05F3/00 (EP,US);
C05F3/06 (AT);
C05F5/00 (EP);
C05F5/002 (US);
C05F7/00 (EP);
C05F7/005 (US);
C05F9/02 (AT);
C05F9/04 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/33] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG VON WERTSTOFFEN | [2020/33] | English: | METHOD FOR RECOVERING VALUABLE SUBSTANCES | [2020/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE SUBSTANCES VALORISABLES | [2020/33] | Entry into regional phase | 30.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 30.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/33] | 30.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 24.04.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.08.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 02.08.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 01.11.2023 | ES | 01.11.2023 | HR | 01.11.2023 | PL | 01.11.2023 | RS | 01.11.2023 | SK | 01.11.2023 | SM | 01.11.2023 | NO | 01.02.2024 | GR | 02.02.2024 | IS | 01.03.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 01.11.2023 | |
ES | 01.11.2023 | ||
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
SM | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/25] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
PL | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 01.11.2023 | |
HR | 01.11.2023 | ||
RS | 01.11.2023 | ||
NO | 01.02.2024 | ||
GR | 02.02.2024 | ||
IS | 01.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 02.02.2024 | |
IS | 01.03.2024 | Cited in | International search | [A]GB2383034 (ACCENTUS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-22 * Seite 1, Zeilen 3-14; Seite 2, Zeilen 27-33; Seite 9, Zeile 16 - Seite 10, Zeile 24;; figures 1, 3; claim 1 *; | [A]DE60101333T (ECOPSI ARRAS [FR]) [A] 1-22* paragraph [0001]; figure 2 * | by applicant | AT20160050387 |