|
19.04.2024 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.04.2024 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2024 |
Letter relating to the revocation of the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
15.01.2024 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
45 |
|
30.11.2023 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.10.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.10.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2023 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
05.10.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
10 |
|
04.10.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
28.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 01 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 02 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 03 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 04 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 05 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 06 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 07 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 08 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 09 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 10 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 11 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 12 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 13 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Auxiliary request during Opposition procedure - 14 |
Opposition |
5 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.09.2023 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
7 |
|
27.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.09.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.09.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2023 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2023 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.09.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2023 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.07.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Letter relating to the request for the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Letter relating to the request for the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Letter relating to the revocation of the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2023 |
Letter relating to the revocation of the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.05.2023 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Opposition |
3 |
|
13.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.03.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.03.2023 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.03.2023 |
Transmittal of decision / summons - opposition |
Opposition |
12 |
|
03.02.2023 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.02.2023 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.01.2023 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
4 |
|
30.01.2023 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.01.2023 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items (CDR) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.01.2023 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's address |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.12.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 006 |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Consolidated list of cited opposition documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2022 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
13 |
|
07.12.2022 |
Communication concerning signing of documents |
Opposition |
2 |
|
30.11.2022 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2022 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items (CDR) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.11.2022 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.09.2022 |
Invitation to file an authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items (CDR) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.09.2022 |
Submission concerning change of proprietor's representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.09.2022 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.08.2022 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
13 |
|
17.08.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
2 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 001 |
Opposition |
51 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 002 |
Opposition |
22 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 003 |
Opposition |
18 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 004 |
Opposition |
40 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Citation in opposition procedure - 005 |
Opposition |
34 |
|
17.08.2022 |
General authorisation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.08.2022 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
07.12.2021 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2021 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2021 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
18.10.2021 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2021 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
04.10.2021 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.09.2021 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (clean copy) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
29.06.2021 |
Text intended for grant (version for approval) |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
02.06.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2021 |
Statement of non-availability of priority search results |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2021 |
Invitation to file a copy of search results(priority) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.11.2020 |
Reply to Written Opinion prepared by the EPO |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2020 |
Communication concerning correction of deficiencies in written opinion/amendment of application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2020 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2020 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
23.04.2020 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.02.2020 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
28.11.2019 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.05.2019 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.04.2019 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
33 |
|
19.12.2018 |
ISR: cited documents |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
19.12.2018 |
International Search Report - copy in English for the IB |
International Searching Authority |
4 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, boxes No. I to VIII |
International Searching Authority |
2 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, cover sheet |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
18.12.2018 |
Written opinion of the ISA, supplemental box |
International Searching Authority |
3 |
|
19.10.2018 |
Notification of receipt of Search copy |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
17.10.2018 |
Notification of the international application number and of the international filing date |
PCT receiving Office |
7 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
15.10.2018 |
Request form for international application (copy for ISA/EP) |
International Searching Authority |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Abstract |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Claims |
PCT receiving Office |
5 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Description |
PCT receiving Office |
23 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Document concerning fees and payments |
PCT receiving Office |
1 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Drawings |
PCT receiving Office |
3 |
|
27.09.2018 |
Request for grant of an International application |
PCT receiving Office |
6 |