06.09.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] |
14.06.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] |
31.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] |
10.05.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] |
19.04.2024 |
Revocation of patent |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
19.04.2024 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] |
16.01.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings |
|
14.01.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that patent is revoked |
|
15.09.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.2023 [2023/42] |
28.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] |
14.07.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.08.2023 [2023/33] |
11.07.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
23.06.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.07.2023 [2023/30] |
28.04.2023 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.05.2023 [2023/22] |
20.03.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
03.02.2023 |
Change - applicant |
published on 08.03.2023 [2023/10] |
31.01.2023 |
New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition |
|
27.01.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
25.01.2023 |
Change - representative |
|
02.12.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.01.2023 [2023/01] |
04.11.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
06.09.2022 |
New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit |
|
26.08.2022 |
Change - opposition data/opponent's data or that of the opponent's representative |
published on 28.09.2022 [2022/39] |
19.08.2022 |
Opposition filed |
published on 21.09.2022 [2022/38] |
05.08.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.09.2022 [2022/36] |
29.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.08.2022 [2022/35] |
22.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.08.2022 [2022/34] |
15.07.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.08.2022 [2022/33] |
27.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.06.2022 [2022/26] |
20.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] |
13.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.06.2022 [2022/24] |
06.05.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.06.2022 [2022/23] |
29.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 01.06.2022 [2022/22] |
22.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.05.2022 [2022/21] |
15.04.2022 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.05.2022 [2022/20] |
22.10.2021 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 24.11.2021 [2021/47] |
19.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.10.2021 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
18.10.2021 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.10.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.09.2021 |
Change - representative |
|
28.06.2021 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
11.12.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
11.12.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 13.01.2021 [2021/02] |
11.11.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.10.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
10.07.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
10.07.2020 |
The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established |
|
10.07.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] |
08.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
05.05.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.04.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
16.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|