Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2020064122 | Global Dossier | 02.04.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76438 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022032418 | Global Dossier | 03.02.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76438 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN112789140B | Global Dossier | 13.06.2023 | B | CN112789140 | 11.05.2021 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76438 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3856456 | Global Dossier | 31.08.2022 | B1 | EP3856456 | 04.08.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76438 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2930057T | 05.12.2022 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76438 | 28.09.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | TWI757628B | 11.03.2022 | B | TW202023745 | 01.07.2020 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2018EP76438 | 28.09.2018 |