EP3684201 - AEROSOL-GENERATING MATERIAL ROD SEGMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.02.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 26.10.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2023/11] |
Former [2021/01] | For all designated states Nicoventures Trading Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | ||
Former [2020/31] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WOODMAN, Tom c/o British American Tobacco (Investements) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | 02 /
ENGLAND, William c/o British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London Greater London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2020/31] | Representative(s) | Brown, Alexander Edward Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2023/11] |
Former [2020/31] | EIP EIP Europe LLP Fairfax House 15 Fulwood Place London WC1V 6HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 18783370.2 | 19.09.2018 | [2020/31] | WO2018EP75395 | Priority number, date | GB20170015380 | 22.09.2017 Original published format: GB 201715380 | [2020/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019057796 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3684201 | Date: | 29.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3684201 | Date: | 15.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/14, A24C5/18 | [2020/31] | CPC: |
A24C5/14 (EP,CN,KR,RU);
A24C5/01 (EP,CN,KR);
A24F42/80 (US);
A24B15/12 (KR);
A24B3/14 (KR,US);
A24C5/18 (CN);
A24C5/1807 (KR);
A24C5/1828 (EP,KR);
A24C5/1892 (KR);
A24C5/28 (CN);
A24D1/025 (KR);
A24D1/20 (EP,KR);
B65H35/02 (CN)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/31] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | STANGENSEGMENT AUS AEROSOLERZEUGENDEM MATERIAL | [2020/31] | English: | AEROSOL-GENERATING MATERIAL ROD SEGMENT | [2020/31] | French: | SEGMENT DE TIGE DE MATÉRIAU DE GÉNÉRATION D'AÉROSOL | [2020/31] | Entry into regional phase | 22.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.01.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/31] | 22.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.10.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.01.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.01.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.01.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23154334.9 / EP4223153 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
21.11.2023
23.11.2023
ADMISSIBLE Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE Opponent's representative von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | 02
15.12.2023
18.12.2023
ADMISSIBLE Imperial Tobacco Limited 121 Winterstoke Road Bristol BS3 2LL / GB Opponent's representative Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2024/04] |
Former [2023/52] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
21.11.2023
Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE Opponent's representative von Tietzen und Hennig, Nikolaus Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 23 80538 München / DE | 04.01.2024 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 02.05.2024 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 15.03.2023 | DK | 15.03.2023 | EE | 15.03.2023 | FI | 15.03.2023 | HR | 15.03.2023 | LV | 15.03.2023 | MC | 15.03.2023 | RS | 15.03.2023 | SE | 15.03.2023 | SI | 15.03.2023 | SM | 15.03.2023 | NO | 15.06.2023 | IS | 15.07.2023 | IE | 19.09.2023 | LU | 19.09.2023 | BE | 30.09.2023 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/33] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
IE | 19.09.2023 | ||
LU | 19.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/28] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
MC | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
LU | 19.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/25] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
LU | 19.09.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
DK | 15.03.2023 | ||
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SI | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/50] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
IS | 15.07.2023 | ||
Former [2023/48] | AT | 15.03.2023 | |
EE | 15.03.2023 | ||
FI | 15.03.2023 | ||
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/46] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
SM | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/36] | FI | 15.03.2023 | |
HR | 15.03.2023 | ||
LV | 15.03.2023 | ||
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
SE | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/35] | HR | 15.03.2023 | |
RS | 15.03.2023 | ||
NO | 15.06.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | RS | 15.03.2023 | Cited in | International search | [XI]GB1234786 (GALLAHER LTD [IE]) [X] 1-7,19,20,22,39-41,43-47,49 * page 1, lines 67-88; figures 1-3 * [I] 21,23-26,33,35-38,48; | [A]US4047536 (ASFOUR EMIL S) [A] 9 * column 2, lines 40-61; figures 1,4,11 ** column 3, lines 21-34 *; | [XI]EP0246107 (REYNOLDS TOBACCO CO R [US]) [X] 1-8,11-49 * column 5, line 56 - column 6, line 12; figure 1 * * column 2, lines 47-51 * * column 3 - columns 63-64 * * column 4, lines 15-25 * * column 4, line 51 - column 5, line 4 * * column 5, lines 18-31,51-55 * * column 6, lines 37-41 * * column 7, lines 26-51,62-65 * * column 8, lines 29-34 * * column 10, lines 34-38 * [I] 9,10; | [XI]US5025814 (RAKER MARK L [US]) [X] 1,23,39 * column 2, line 40 - column 3, line 11; figures 1,9 * * column 12, line 57 - column 13, line 5 * [I] 6 | Opposition | US3299895 | GB1234786 | EP0246107 | US5025814 | WO2009065459 | WO2012164009 | CN107048469 | GB1279724 | US4732165 | GB2229349 | WO2011101164 | WO2015082648 | WO2017072149 |