EP3581269 - CATALYST FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION AND METHOD OF PREPARATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2019/51] | CATALYST FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION | ||
[2022/26] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.08.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.06.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.01.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.11.2019 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cataler Corporation 7800, Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | [2019/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OISHI, Shunsuke c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | 02 /
KAWAMURA, Shogo c/o CATALER CORPORATION ARK Creation Centre 1905-10 Shimonobe Iwata-shi Shizuoka 438-0112 / JP | 03 /
NAGATA, Takahiro c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | 04 /
ORI, Hirotaka c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | 05 /
ITOU, Minoru c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | [2020/30] |
Former [2019/51] | 01 /
OISHI, Shunsuke c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | ||
02 /
KAWAMURA, Shogo c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | |||
03 /
NAGATA, Takahiro c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | |||
04 /
ORI, Hirotaka c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | |||
05 /
ITOU, Minoru c/o CATALER CORPORATION 7800 Chihama Kakegawa-shi Shizuoka 437-1492 / JP | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2019/51] | Application number, filing date | 18783833.9 | 09.04.2018 | [2019/51] | WO2018JP14939 | Priority number, date | JP20170078366 | 11.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017078366 | [2019/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018190300 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3581269 | Date: | 18.12.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3581269 | Date: | 28.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B01J27/055, B01J35/04, F01N3/022, F01N3/28, B01J37/02, B01D53/94, C01F11/46, F01N3/10, B01J35/00, B01J23/58 | [2022/26] | CPC: |
B01J23/58 (EP);
B01J27/053 (US);
B01D53/94 (EP);
B01D53/9413 (US);
B01D53/944 (US);
B01D53/9468 (US);
B01J23/464 (US);
B01J27/055 (EP);
B01J35/19 (EP,US);
B01J35/394 (EP);
B01J35/56 (EP,US);
B01J37/02 (EP);
B01J37/0228 (US);
B01J37/0236 (US);
B01J37/0244 (EP);
B01J37/086 (US);
F01N3/0222 (EP);
F01N3/10 (EP);
F01N3/101 (EP);
F01N3/2825 (EP);
F01N3/2839 (US);
B01D2255/1023 (US);
B01D2255/1025 (US);
B01D2255/2042 (US);
B01D2255/9022 (US);
B01D2255/908 (US);
C01F11/46 (EP);
F01N2510/068 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2019/51] | B01J27/053, B01D53/94, B01J37/02, F01N3/10, C01F11/46, B01J23/58, B01J35/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2019/51] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KATALYSATOR ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN | [2022/26] | English: | CATALYST FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION AND METHOD OF PREPARATION | [2022/26] | French: | CATALYSEUR POUR LA PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ DE PREPARATION | [2022/27] |
Former [2019/51] | KATALYSATOR ZUR ABGASREINIGUNG | ||
Former [2019/51] | CATALYST FOR EXHAUST GAS PURIFICATION | ||
Former [2019/51] | CATALYSEUR POUR LA PURIFICATION DE GAZ D'ÉCHAPPEMENT | Entry into regional phase | 12.09.2019 | Translation filed | 12.09.2019 | National basic fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Search fee paid | 12.09.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.09.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.2019 | Examination requested [2019/51] | 10.06.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.01.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.05.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.06.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.08.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 28.09.2022 | AT | 28.09.2022 | CZ | 28.09.2022 | DK | 28.09.2022 | EE | 28.09.2022 | ES | 28.09.2022 | FI | 28.09.2022 | HR | 28.09.2022 | IT | 28.09.2022 | LT | 28.09.2022 | LV | 28.09.2022 | MC | 28.09.2022 | NL | 28.09.2022 | PL | 28.09.2022 | RO | 28.09.2022 | RS | 28.09.2022 | SE | 28.09.2022 | SI | 28.09.2022 | SK | 28.09.2022 | SM | 28.09.2022 | NO | 28.12.2022 | GR | 29.12.2022 | IS | 28.01.2023 | PT | 30.01.2023 | IE | 09.04.2023 | LU | 09.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
IE | 09.04.2023 | ||
LU | 09.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/12] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
MC | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
LU | 09.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/51] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SI | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/34] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
DK | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
NL | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 28.09.2022 | |
AT | 28.09.2022 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/26] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
PL | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
IS | 28.01.2023 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
EE | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SK | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 28.09.2022 | |
CZ | 28.09.2022 | ||
ES | 28.09.2022 | ||
FI | 28.09.2022 | ||
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RO | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
PT | 30.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
SM | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
HR | 28.09.2022 | ||
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
GR | 29.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
LV | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 28.09.2022 | |
LT | 28.09.2022 | ||
RS | 28.09.2022 | ||
SE | 28.09.2022 | ||
NO | 28.12.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2011245076 (MATSUEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * Comparative examples 14-18;; table 2 * * paragraphs [0065] , [0 66] * [A] 5-7[I] 3; | [XAI]US2012065058 (MATSUEDA SATOSHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,4 * Comparative Examples 2, 4;; table 1 * * paragraph [0089] * [A] 5-7 [I] 3 | International search | [A]WO2010137658 (CATALER CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , & US 2012/0071318 A1 & EP 2436442 A1 & CN 102448608 A *; | [A]WO2010147163 (CATALER CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]WO2011030831 (CATALER CORP [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * , *; | [A]JP2014505587 [A] 1-7 * , *; | [XA]WO2014156746 (N E CHEMCAT CORP [JP]) [X] 1-4 * , * [A] 5-7; | [A]CN104741135 (UNIV NORTHWESTERN) [A] 1-7* , * | Examination | US2008314291 | by applicant | JPH01285639 | JPH05237390 | JP2017078366 |