EP3609661 - STRONG AND TOUGH STRUCTURAL WOOD MATERIALS, AND METHODS FOR FABRICATING AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 05.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 29.10.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states University of Maryland, College Park UM Ventures 0134 Lee Building 7809 Regents Drive College Park, MD 20742 / US | [2024/15] |
Former [2020/08] | For all designated states University of Maryland, College Park Office of Technology Commercialization 2130 Mitchell Building 7999 Regents Drive College Park, MD 20742 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Liangbing 10407 Democracy Ln Potomac MD 20854 / US | 02 /
ZHU, Mingwei Room 503 No. 3 Qingdao Road Gulou District Nanjing 210093 / CN | 03 /
SONG, Jianwei 5116 Kensaw Street College Park, MD 20740 / US | [2020/28] |
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
HU, Liangbing 7014 Hunter Lane Hyattsville, MD 20782 / US | ||
02 /
ZHU, Mingwei Room 503 No. 3 Qingdao Road Gulou District Nanjing 210093 / CN | |||
03 /
SONG, Jianwei 5116 Kensaw Street College Park, MD 20740 / US | Representative(s) | Dehns St. Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18783970.9 | 09.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018US26742 | Priority number, date | US201762483828P | 10.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762483828 P | US201862627600P | 07.02.2018 Original published format: US 201862627600 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018191181 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609661 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3609661 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.10.2020 | Classification | IPC: | B27K5/00, B27K1/00, B27K5/06, D21C3/00, D21C3/02, B27K5/04 | [2020/47] | CPC: |
B27K5/065 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B27K3/32 (CN,KR);
B27K3/0278 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D11/0288 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B01D11/0492 (EP,CN,KR);
B27K3/153 (EP,CN,KR);
B27K3/16 (EP,CN,US);
B27K3/20 (CN,KR,US);
B27K3/34 (EP,CN,KR);
B27K3/36 (CN,US);
B27K3/38 (CN,US);
B27K3/48 (CN,US);
B27K5/007 (EP,CN,KR);
B27K5/02 (CN,KR);
B27K5/04 (EP,CN);
B32B21/13 (CN,US);
B32B7/12 (US);
D21C3/00 (EP,CN,KR);
D21C3/022 (CN,US);
D21C3/12 (CN,US);
D21C9/005 (CN,US);
D21C9/007 (CN,US);
B27K2240/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
B27K2240/30 (CN,US);
B27K2240/70 (CN,KR,US);
B32B2307/558 (CN);
B32B2419/00 (CN,US);
B32B2439/00 (CN);
B32B2479/00 (CN,US);
B32B2571/00 (CN,US);
B32B2605/08 (CN);
B32B2605/10 (CN);
B32B2605/12 (CN);
B32B2605/18 (CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | B27K5/00, B27K1/00, B27K5/06, D21C3/00, D21C3/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FESTE UND ZÄHE HOLZBAUSTOFFE UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG | [2020/08] | English: | STRONG AND TOUGH STRUCTURAL WOOD MATERIALS, AND METHODS FOR FABRICATING AND USE THEREOF | [2020/08] | French: | MATÉRIAUX EN BOIS STRUCTURAUX FORTS ET RÉSISTANTS, ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION DESDITS MATÉRIAUX | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 29.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 29.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 29.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 13.05.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.11.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.06.2022 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 08.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.2023 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.10.2023 | 16.10.2023 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 06.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 05.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP24161497.3 | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 08.08.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 08.08.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 17.08.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 12.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4012280 (HOLTON HARRY HUTCHINSON); | [XI]US2014370319 (VETTER GEORG [SE], et al); | [X]CN105563570 (DEHUA TB NEW DECORATION MATERIAL CO LTD); | International search | [Y]US2008221263 (KANAGASABAPATHY SUBBAREDDY [US], et al); | [Y]CA2608174 (VOON GERARD G V [CA]); | [Y]CN104774485 (FUYANG JINMU ARTS & CRAFTS CO LTD); | [Y]WO2016173743 (PFS COATINGS LTD [GB]); | Examination | CN106493815 |