22.08.2024 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] |
19.08.2024 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
19.08.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
19.08.2024 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
17.04.2024 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
15.03.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
15.03.2024 |
Change - classification |
published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] |
31.01.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.02.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.08.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
16.02.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.01.2021 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
25.12.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
25.12.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 27.01.2021 [2021/04] |
31.08.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
25.08.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
17.04.2020 |
Change - representative |
|
17.04.2020 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
02.03.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.11.2019 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
22.11.2019 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.12.2019 [2019/52] |
18.09.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
14.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.08.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
13.08.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.02.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.12.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
31.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
20.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|