EP3604431 - RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.09.2021 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Osaka Umeda Twin Towers South, 1-13-1 Umeda, Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2023/03] |
Former [2020/06] | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAGUCHI, Shuhei c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
NAKAUE, Ayane c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
KOMORI, Masaji c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
KONO, Hideki c/o DAIKIN INDUSTRIES Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-Chome Kita-ku Osaka-Shi Osaka 530-8323 / JP | [2020/06] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/06] | Application number, filing date | 18784843.7 | 11.04.2018 | [2020/06] | WO2018JP15230 | Priority number, date | JP20170080963 | 14.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017080963 | [2020/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018190371 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3604431 | Date: | 05.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 11.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C08L27/16, C08L27/18, C08L33/12, C08F214/22 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
C08L27/16 (EP,US);
B29C45/00 (US);
B29C49/00 (US);
C08F214/22 (EP);
C08L27/18 (US);
C08L33/12 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C08F214/22, C08F214/26 (EP);
C08L27/16, C08L33/12 (EP);
C08L33/12, C08L27/16 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2020/06] | C08L27/16, C08L27/18, C08L33/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/06] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND FORMKÖRPER | [2020/06] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION AND MOLDED BODY | [2020/06] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE ET CORPS MOULÉ | [2020/06] | Entry into regional phase | 25.10.2019 | Translation filed | 25.10.2019 | National basic fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Search fee paid | 25.10.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.10.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.2019 | Examination requested [2020/06] | 09.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.01.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JPS5941348 (DAIKIN IND LTD, et al) [A] 1 * table 1 * * claims 1,2 *; | [X]US4710426 (STEPHENS ROBERT K [US]) [X] 1-3 * example 1 *; | [XI]US2005019584 (TSUDA NOBUHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1,2,5 * paragraph [0084] - paragraph [0085] * * examples 6-9; table 3 * [I] 4; | [A]JP2009061401 (GUNZE KK) [A] 1 * Comparative Example 2 *; | [A]US2011255210 (TATEMICHI MAYUKO [JP], et al) [A] 1-5* Examples * | International search | [X]JPS63159459 (CENTRAL GLASS CO LTD) [X] 1-5 * , entire text, in particular, claims, page 3, upper right column, lines 2-6, table 1 & US 4861835 A, claims, column 3, lines 61-66, table 1 & GB 2199583 A & DE 3743607 A & FR 2608615 A & IT 1223589 B *; | [XA]WO2012036297 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [X] 1, 4-5 * , entire text, in particular, comparative examples 3, 4 & JP 2012-82414 A & CN 102959000 A *[A] 2-3; | [X]JP2013082925 (DAIKIN IND LTD) [X] 1-5 * , entire text, in particular, claims, paragraphs [0024], [0075]-[0082] & US 2014/0235783 A1, claims, paragraphs [0027], [0028], [0091]-[0101] & WO 2013/047880 A1 & CN 103827203 A *; | [X]JP2014152186 (JSR CORP) [X] 1-5 * , entire text, in particular, claims, examples 1-6, 15, comparative examples 1-3, 8 (Family: none) * | by applicant | JPH02102252 | JPH06172452 | JPH07201316 | WO2015146752 |