EP3609586 - GOLF SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 03.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ank Partners Inc. 400 3rd Avenue SW Suite 3700 Calgary, Alberta T2P 4H2 / CA | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KORPACH, Arthur Neil 31200 Elbow River Dr. Calgary Alberta T3Z 2T8 / CA | [2023/29] |
Former [2020/08] | 01 /
KORPACH, Arthur, Neil 31200 Elbow River Dr. Calgary Alberta T3Z 2T8 / CA | Representative(s) | Meissner Bolte Partnerschaft mbB Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | [2023/49] |
Former [2020/08] | Trinks, Ole Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 10 26 05 86016 Augsburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18784849.4 | 10.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018CA50437 | Priority number, date | US201762483618P | 10.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762483618 P | [2020/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018187865 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3609586 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3609586 | Date: | 06.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 18.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.04.2021 | Classification | IPC: | A63B67/02, A63F13/812, A63F13/245 | [2021/04] | CPC: |
A63F13/245 (EP,CN,US);
A63B69/3691 (KR,US);
A63B57/00 (CN);
A63B69/3658 (KR,US);
A63B71/0622 (KR);
A63F13/573 (EP);
A63F13/812 (EP,CN,US);
G09B19/0038 (EP,CN,KR,US);
G09B9/00 (US);
A63B2071/0647 (KR);
A63B2102/32 (US);
A63B2220/10 (KR);
A63B2220/24 (KR);
A63B2220/30 (KR,US);
A63B2220/70 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2020/08] | A63B67/02, G06F19/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GOLFSYSTEM | [2020/08] | English: | GOLF SYSTEM | [2020/08] | French: | SYSTÈME DE GOLF | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 07.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 07.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 10.11.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.10.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 31.10.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 31.10.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP23214168.9 / EP4306190 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 06.12.2023 | ES | 06.12.2023 | HR | 06.12.2023 | PL | 06.12.2023 | RO | 06.12.2023 | RS | 06.12.2023 | SK | 06.12.2023 | SM | 06.12.2023 | NO | 06.03.2024 | GR | 07.03.2024 | IS | 06.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 06.12.2023 | |
ES | 06.12.2023 | ||
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RO | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
SM | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
IS | 06.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 06.12.2023 | |
HR | 06.12.2023 | ||
RS | 06.12.2023 | ||
NO | 06.03.2024 | ||
GR | 07.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 07.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2009036237 (NIPPER J MATTHEW [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * paragraphs [0037] - [0039] - [0 42] , [0057] - [0058] - [0062]; figures 1,11 * [Y] 5,8,9 [I] 4,6; | [Y]US2014004967 (JANG HYUNG WOOK [KR], et al) [Y] 5,8,9* paragraphs [0028] , [0052] - [0060]; figures 1,4a * | International search | [A]US3563553 (BALDWIN BRADFORD J, et al) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures *; | [A]CA2017424 (CURCHOD DONALD B [US]) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures *; | [A]CA2118000 (ARNOLD FLOYD L [US], et al) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures *; | [A]CA2602978 (VISUAL SPORTS SYSTEMS [CA]) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures *; | [A]CN201286964Y (JIACHENG YE [CN]) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures *; | [A]CA2785987 (GOLFZON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures *; | [A]CA2875756 (GOLFZON CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures *; | [Y]CA2830497 (GOLFZON CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 5-8, 10, 11, 15, 16 *see description page 6 paragraph 1, abstract and figures *; | [A]US2012267855 (CHOI SONG HWAN [KR]) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures *; | [A]US2014155186 (LEE JUNG HUN [KR], et al) [A] 1-22*see abstract and figures *; | [XY]CA2916462 (ORIGIN LLC [US]) [X] 1-4, 9, 12-14, 17-22 *see abstract, description and figures * [Y] 5-8, 10, 11, 15, 16; | [A]CA2959499 (ORIGIN LLC [US]) [A] 1-22 *see abstract and figures * | Examination | US2017036095 |