EP3610793 - PHYSIOLOGICAL STATE ASSESSMENT APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.07.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IT | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | For all designated states Tokyo Institute of Technology 12-1, Ookayama 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2020/08] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ARAI, Junichiro c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 02 /
GOTOU, Takashi c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 03 /
MATSUBARA, Akira c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 04 /
HIRAYAMA, Takahiro c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 05 /
HASHIZUME, Hideki c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 06 /
HASHIMOTO, Arina c/o Daikin Industries, Ltd. Umeda Center Building 4-12 Nakazaki-Nishi 2-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 530-8323 / JP | 07 /
KOTANI, Yasunori c/o Tokyo Institute of Technology 12-1, Ookayama 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 08 /
TOMATSU, Taro c/o Tokyo Institute of Technology 12-1, Ookayama 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | 09 /
OHGAMI, Yoshimi c/o Tokyo Institute of Technology 12-1, Ookayama 2-chome Meguro-ku Tokyo 152-8550 / JP | [2020/08] | Representative(s) | Global IP Europe Patentanwaltskanzlei Pfarrstraße 14 80538 München / DE | [2020/08] | Application number, filing date | 18784945.0 | 12.04.2018 | [2020/08] | WO2018JP15404 | Priority number, date | JP20170080917 | 14.04.2017 Original published format: JP 2017080917 | [2020/08] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018190403 | Date: | 18.10.2018 | Language: | JA | [2018/42] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3610793 | Date: | 19.02.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/08] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3610793 | Date: | 31.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.2020 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/16, A61B5/00, A61B5/18, A61B5/01 | [2022/12] | CPC: |
A61B5/168 (EP);
A61B5/4064 (EP,US);
A61B5/004 (US);
A61B5/015 (EP);
A61B5/18 (EP);
A61B5/377 (EP,US);
G06T7/0012 (US);
G06V40/162 (US);
G06V40/166 (US);
|
Former IPC [2021/02] | A61B5/16, A61B5/00, A61B5/18, A61B5/0476, A61B5/0484, A61B5/01 | ||
Former IPC [2020/08] | A61B5/16, A61B5/00, A61B5/18, A61B5/0476, A61B5/0484 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/08] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEURTEILUNG EINES PHYSIOLOGISCHEN ZUSTANDS | [2020/08] | English: | PHYSIOLOGICAL STATE ASSESSMENT APPARATUS | [2020/08] | French: | APPAREIL D'ÉVALUATION D'ÉTAT PHYSIOLOGIQUE | [2020/08] | Entry into regional phase | 08.11.2019 | Translation filed | 08.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 08.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 08.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/08] | 28.07.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 20.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 20.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP21205403.5 / EP3973874 | Opposition(s) | 01.06.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AL | 31.08.2022 | AT | 31.08.2022 | CZ | 31.08.2022 | DK | 31.08.2022 | EE | 31.08.2022 | ES | 31.08.2022 | FI | 31.08.2022 | HR | 31.08.2022 | IT | 31.08.2022 | LT | 31.08.2022 | LV | 31.08.2022 | MC | 31.08.2022 | NL | 31.08.2022 | PL | 31.08.2022 | RO | 31.08.2022 | RS | 31.08.2022 | SE | 31.08.2022 | SI | 31.08.2022 | SK | 31.08.2022 | SM | 31.08.2022 | NO | 30.11.2022 | GR | 01.12.2022 | IS | 31.12.2022 | PT | 02.01.2023 | IE | 12.04.2023 | LU | 12.04.2023 | BE | 30.04.2023 | CH | 30.04.2023 | LI | 30.04.2023 | [2024/26] |
Former [2024/21] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
IE | 12.04.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/12] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
BE | 30.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
CH | 30.04.2023 | ||
LI | 30.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
MC | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2024/04] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
LU | 12.04.2023 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SI | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
NL | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 31.08.2022 | |
AT | 31.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/23] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
EE | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SK | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/22] | AT | 31.08.2022 | |
CZ | 31.08.2022 | ||
DK | 31.08.2022 | ||
ES | 31.08.2022 | ||
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RO | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
PT | 02.01.2023 | ||
Former [2023/21] | DK | 31.08.2022 | |
FI | 31.08.2022 | ||
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
SM | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
IS | 31.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/11] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
PL | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
HR | 31.08.2022 | ||
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
GR | 01.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
LV | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | FI | 31.08.2022 | |
LT | 31.08.2022 | ||
RS | 31.08.2022 | ||
SE | 31.08.2022 | ||
NO | 30.11.2022 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP2012034839 (UNIV TOKYO AGRICULTURE & TECHNOLOGY, et al) [A] 1-10* figures 1,2,7 *; | [XA]US2015363657 (SHIGEMURA SHUSAKU [JP]) [X] 1-9 * paragraphs [0008] , [0009] , [0044] , [0046] , [0069] , [0077] , [0091] , [0092] , [0122] - [0136]; figures 1-14 * [A] 10; | [I]WO2016035719 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) [I] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [P]EP3189777 (DAIKIN IND LTD [JP], et al) | International search | [XA]JP2008259676 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD) [X] 1-9 * , * [A] 10; | [XA]JP2008282153 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) [X] 1-9 * , * [A] 10; | [A]JP2011067284 (AISIN SEIKI) [A] 1-10* , [( * | by applicant | JP2013176406 |