Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2023212677 | Global Dossier | 06.07.2023 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202218084115 | 19.12.2022 | US201762484365 | 11.04.2017 | WO2018IL50416 | 11.04.2018 | US201916603613 | 08.10.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11530447 | Global Dossier | 20.12.2022 | B2 | US2020040396 | 06.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201816603613 | 11.04.2018 | US201762484365 | 11.04.2017 | WO2018IL50416 | 11.04.2018 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3612828 | Global Dossier | 30.12.2020 | A4 | EP3612828 | 26.02.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762484365 | 11.04.2017 | WO2018IL50416 | 11.04.2018 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2018189743 | Global Dossier | 18.10.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201762484365 | 11.04.2017 |