EP3697391 - MINI-TABLETS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 24.03.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.04.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 22.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DFE Pharma GmbH & Co. KG Klever Strasse 187 47574 Goch / DE | [2020/35] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
VAN DEN HEUVEL, Korinde c/o FrieslandCampina Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 238 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | 02 /
VAN LAARHOVEN, Bas c/o FrieslandCampina Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 238 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | 03 /
JANSSEN, Eva Maria c/o FrieslandCampina Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 238 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | 04 /
VAN HAANDEL, Mara Maria Wilhelmina c/o FrieslandCampina Intellectual Property Department P.O. Box 238 6700 AE Wageningen / NL | [2020/35] | Representative(s) | FrieslandCampina IP Department Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | [N/P] |
Former [2020/35] | FrieslandCampina Nederland B.V. Bronland 20 6708 WH Wageningen / NL | Application number, filing date | 18785381.7 | 17.10.2018 | [2020/35] | WO2018EP78315 | Priority number, date | EP20170197153 | 18.10.2017 Original published format: EP 17197153 | [2020/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019076940 | Date: | 25.04.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3697391 | Date: | 26.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.04.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.04.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/20, C13B50/00 | [2020/35] | CPC: |
A61K9/2095 (EP);
A61K9/2018 (EP,US);
A61K31/167 (US);
A61K9/2072 (EP);
C13K5/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/35] | Title | German: | MINI-TABLETS | [2020/35] | English: | MINI-TABLETS | [2020/35] | French: | MINI-COMPRIMÉS | [2020/35] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2020 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2020 | Examination requested [2020/35] | 23.03.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 27.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2020 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 15.01.2021 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 24.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.10.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.10.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XDYI]WO2006068484 (CAMPINA NEDERLAND HOLDING BV [NL], et al) [XD] 5,10 * page 3, line 5 - page 4, line 2 * * page 6, line 31 - page 7, line 16 * * page 7, line 25 - page 8, line 4 * * page 12, line 2 - line 4 * * example - * * claim - * [Y] 1-4 [I] 5-12; | [XI]US2013224293 (DOKOU ELENI [US], et al) [X] 13,14 * examples 1,14-20 * * claim - *[I] 13-16; | [Y] - P. LENNARTZ ET AL, "Minitabletting: improving the compactability of paracetamol powder mixtures", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF PHARMACEUTICS, NL, (19981001), vol. 173, no. 1-2, doi:10.1016/S0378-5173(98)00206-3, ISSN 0378-5173, pages 75 - 85, XP055465276 [Y] 1-4 * abstract * * paragraphs [02.2] , [2.3.1] * * page 81, column l - column r; figure 4; table 1 * * page 82, column l - column r, paragraph 1; figures 5,6 * * page 83, column l, paragraph 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(98)00206-3 | by applicant | EP0509606 | WO2006068484 | WO2011025673 | - JIVRAJ et al., Pharm. Sci. Technolo.Today, (20000200), vol. 3, no. 2, pages 58 - 63 | - P. LENNARTZ et al., "Minitabletting: improving the compactability of paracetamol powder mixtures", International Journal of Pharmaceutics, (19981001), vol. 173, no. 1-2, doi:doi:10.1016/S0378-5173(98)00206-3, pages 75 - 85, XP055465276 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0378-5173(98)00206-3 | - DIETMAR SCHULTZE, Properties of powders and bulk solids, Ostfalia University for Applied sciences |