EP3688738 - VEHICLE LOCALIZATION BASED ON NEURAL NETWORK [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.10.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.10.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Autonomous Mobility US, LLC One Continental Drive Auburn Hills, Michigan 48326 / US | [2022/42] |
Former [2020/52] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. One Continental Drive Auburn Hills MI 48326 / US | ||
Former [2020/32] | For all designated states Continental Automotive Systems, Inc. One Continental Drive Auburn Hills, MI 48326 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Dalong c/0 Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | 02 /
FROEHLICH, Dominik 1012 Cherokee Ave Royal Oak Michigan 48607 / US | 03 /
MUHAREMOVIC, Ibro 32032 Margaret Ct. Warren Michigan 48903 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | 01 /
LI, Dalong 3055 Primrose Dr. Rochester Hills Michigan 48307 / US | ||
02 /
FROEHLICH, Dominik 1012 Cherokee Ave Royal Oak Michigan 48607 / US | |||
03 /
MUHAREMOVIC, Ibro 32032 Margaret Ct. Warren Michigan 48903 / US | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive GmbH Intellectual Property Nordostpark 30 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2020/32] | Bobbert, Christiana Conti Temic microelectronic GmbH Intellectual Property Sieboldstrasse 19 90411 Nürnberg / DE | Application number, filing date | 18786167.9 | 25.09.2018 | [2020/32] | WO2018US52633 | Priority number, date | US201762562841P | 25.09.2017 Original published format: US 201762562841 P | US201816139433 | 24.09.2018 Original published format: US201816139433 | [2020/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019060886 | Date: | 28.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3688738 | Date: | 05.08.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 28.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/01, G08G1/16, G08G1/00, G01S19/38, G01S5/02, G01S19/13 | [2020/32] | CPC: |
G08G1/0104 (EP,US);
G01S19/49 (EP,US);
G01C21/30 (US);
G01S19/48 (EP,US);
G01S19/485 (EP,US);
G06N3/08 (US);
G07C5/008 (US);
G08G1/0112 (EP,US);
G08G1/161 (EP,US);
G08G1/22 (EP,US);
G01C22/00 (US);
G01S19/13 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/32] | Title | German: | FAHRZEUGORTUNG AUF DER BASIS EINES NEURONALEN NETZES | [2020/32] | English: | VEHICLE LOCALIZATION BASED ON NEURAL NETWORK | [2020/32] | French: | LOCALISATION DE VÉHICULE À BASE DE RÉSEAU NEURONAL | [2020/32] | Entry into regional phase | 28.04.2020 | National basic fee paid | 28.04.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.04.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.04.2020 | Examination requested [2020/32] | 28.04.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.11.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.10.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.02.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 30.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]WO2008001493 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,12-14 * paragraphs [0025] - [0058] * * paragraphs [0076] - [0081] * * paragraphs [0082] - [0086] * * paragraphs [0092] , [0 93] , [0 97] , [0 98] * * paragraphs [0100] - [0102] - [ 104] * * paragraphs [0122] , [ 123] , [ 127] , [ 129] * [I] 2,3,7,8,10,11,15,16; | [XI]EP2402923 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]) [X] 1,4,5,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0006] - [0021] * * paragraphs [0027] - [0033] * * paragraphs [0036] - [0039] * * paragraphs [0040] - [0049] * [I] 2,3,7,8,10,11,15,16; | [XI]US2012065876 (KADOWAKI YOSHINORI [JP], et al) [X] 1,4-6,9,12-14 * paragraphs [0037] - [0040] - [0 42] , [0 46] , [0 47] * [I] 2,3,7,8,10,11,15,16; | [XI]US2012209519 (BASNAYAKE CHAMINDA [CA]) [X] 1,4,5,9,12,13 * paragraphs [0014] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0032] , [0 37] , [0 38] , [0 40] *[I] 2,3,7,8,10,11,15,16 |