EP3861181 - SYSTEM FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF LIQUIDS IN A ROTATABLE BUILDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 25.07.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 10.03.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 09.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.04.2020 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LM Tech S.r.l. Viale Papiniano, 44 20123 Milano / IT | [2021/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MERCOLINI, Lorenzo c/o LM TECH S.R.L. Viale Papiniano, 44 20123 Milano / IT | [2021/32] | Representative(s) | Leihkauf, Steffen Falk, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Via Senato, 8 20121 Milano / IT | [2021/32] | Application number, filing date | 18786419.4 | 01.10.2018 | [2021/32] | WO2018IB57609 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2020070537 | Date: | 09.04.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/15] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3861181 | Date: | 11.08.2021 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.04.2020 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2021/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2020 | Classification | IPC: | E04B1/346 | [2021/32] | CPC: |
E04B1/3465 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/32] | Extension states | BA | 09.04.2021 | ME | 09.04.2021 | Validation states | KH | 09.04.2021 | MA | 09.04.2021 | MD | 09.04.2021 | TN | 09.04.2021 | Title | German: | SYSTEM ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON FLÜSSIGKEITEN IN EINEM DREHBAREN GEBÄUDE | [2021/32] | English: | SYSTEM FOR THE TRANSMISSION OF LIQUIDS IN A ROTATABLE BUILDING | [2021/32] | French: | SYSTÈME DESTINÉ À LA TRANSMISSION DE LIQUIDES DANS UN BÂTIMENT ROTATIF | [2021/32] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/32] | 25.03.2021 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 14.03.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US407877 ; | [XI]US2563531 ; | [XYI]US2927599 (JOHN STETSON); | [XI]FR1242847 ; | [XI]FR1420219 ; | [XI]FR2063633 (MAS ROLAND); | [XDI]US7107725 (JOHNSTONE III ALBERT E [US], et al); | [Y]DE102007047259 (KRONES AG [DE]) | by applicant | US841468 | US3905166 | US6742308 | US7107725 | US2006248808 | WO2007148192 | US2009205264 |