EP3681679 - QUICK ROBOT ARM TOOL CHANGER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.03.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 26.03.2021 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 09.02.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 19.06.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 22.03.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Buind, Kjell Brenna 3533 Tyristrand / NO | [2021/17] |
Former [2020/30] | For all designated states Buind, Kjell Brenna 3533 Tyristrand / NO | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2020/30] | Representative(s) | IP-Safe ApS Banegårdspladsen 1 1570 Copenhagen V / DK | [2020/30] | Application number, filing date | 18786430.1 | 10.09.2018 | [2020/30] | WO2018NO50226 | Priority number, date | NO20170001482 | 14.09.2017 Original published format: NO 20171482 | [2020/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2019054880 | Date: | 21.03.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3681679 | Date: | 22.07.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.03.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3681679 | Date: | 28.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 21.03.2019 | Classification | IPC: | B25J15/04 | [2020/30] | CPC: |
B25J15/0408 (EP,US);
B25J15/0458 (KR);
B25J11/0055 (US);
B25J15/0019 (KR,US);
B25J19/0025 (US);
B25J9/12 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/30] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHNELLER ROBOTERARM-WERKZEUGWECHSLER | [2020/30] | English: | QUICK ROBOT ARM TOOL CHANGER | [2020/30] | French: | CHANGEUR D'OUTIL À BRAS DE ROBOT RAPIDE | [2020/30] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2020 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2020 | Examination requested [2020/30] | 18.02.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.10.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2021 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.2021 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.2021 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.03.2021 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 31.01.2022 | No opposition filed within time limit [2022/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 10.09.2018 | AL | 28.04.2021 | AT | 28.04.2021 | CY | 28.04.2021 | EE | 28.04.2021 | HR | 28.04.2021 | LT | 28.04.2021 | LV | 28.04.2021 | MC | 28.04.2021 | MK | 28.04.2021 | MT | 28.04.2021 | NL | 28.04.2021 | SI | 28.04.2021 | SK | 28.04.2021 | SM | 28.04.2021 | BG | 28.07.2021 | GR | 29.07.2021 | IS | 28.08.2021 | PT | 30.08.2021 | IE | 10.09.2021 | LU | 10.09.2021 | BE | 30.09.2021 | CH | 30.09.2021 | LI | 30.09.2021 | [2024/42] |
Former [2024/23] | HU | 10.09.2018 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
MK | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 10.09.2021 | ||
LU | 10.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/33] | HU | 10.09.2018 | |
AL | 28.04.2021 | ||
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 10.09.2021 | ||
LU | 10.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2023/30] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
CY | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 10.09.2021 | ||
LU | 10.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/37] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 10.09.2021 | ||
LU | 10.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
CH | 30.09.2021 | ||
LI | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/35] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IE | 10.09.2021 | ||
LU | 10.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/34] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
LU | 10.09.2021 | ||
BE | 30.09.2021 | ||
Former [2022/29] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SI | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/25] | AL | 28.04.2021 | |
AT | 28.04.2021 | ||
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
MC | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/23] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2022/10] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
EE | 28.04.2021 | ||
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SK | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
IS | 22.12.2021 | ||
Former [2022/07] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
SM | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/51] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
IS | 28.08.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/50] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
PT | 30.08.2021 | ||
Former [2021/49] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
HR | 28.04.2021 | ||
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
LV | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
GR | 29.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/47] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
LT | 28.04.2021 | ||
NL | 28.04.2021 | ||
BG | 28.07.2021 | ||
Former [2021/46] | AT | 28.04.2021 | |
LT | 28.04.2021 | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2615664 (REEVES ARTHUR E) [Y] 6-8 * figures 1,2,5,6,7 * * column 1, line 59 - column 2, line 16 * * column 2, line 35 - line 44 *; | [X]US3021149 (GRIFFIN ALVIN G) [X] 1,2,4,5 * figure - *; | [X]US5664793 (ENGIBAROV EDDY [US]) [X] 1,2,4,5 * abstract *; | [XY]US6182491 (PERLMAN MAURICE [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,5,9-12,14 * abstract * * column 1, line 4 - line 16 * * column 3, line 53 - line 61 * * column 4, line 12 - line 27 * * column 6, line 28 - line 32 * * column 6, line 55 - line 63 * * column 7, line 51 - line 64 * [Y] 6-8; | [A]DE202016003670U (TÜNKERS-NICKEL DOSIERSYSTEME GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-14 * figure 1 * * paragraph [0030] * * paragraph [0015] *; | [XP]WO2018111575 (THINK SURGICAL INC [US]) [XP] 1,2,4,5* figures 4a,4b,4c,4d,5a,5b,5c,5d * | by applicant | US4636135 |