EP3700513 - NON-STEROIDAL SELECTIVE GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR AGONISTIC MODULATORS (SEGRAMS) AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2020/36] | NON-STEROIDAL SELECTIVE GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR AGONISTIC MODULATORS (SEGRAMs) AND USES THEREOF | ||
[2022/14] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.07.2022 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 24.03.2022 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 11.12.2020 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.07.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.05.2019 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Association pour la recherche à l'IGBMC (ARI) 4 rue du Dr Albert Schweitzer 67113 Blaesheim / FR | [2022/16] |
Former [2020/36] | For all designated states Association pour la recherche à l'IGBMC (ARI) 4 rue du Dr. Albert 67113 Blaesheim / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHAMBON, Pierre 4 rue du Dr Albert Schweitzer 67113 Blaesheim / FR | 02 /
HUA, Guoqiang 4 rue Georges Laufenburger 67400 Illkirch-Graffenstaden / FR | [2020/36] | Representative(s) | Icosa 83 avenue Denfert-Rochereau 75014 Paris / FR | [2020/36] | Application number, filing date | 18786823.7 | 23.10.2018 | [2020/36] | WO2018EP79049 | Priority number, date | US201762578036P | 27.10.2017 Original published format: US 201762578036 P | EP20180305612 | 17.05.2018 Original published format: EP 18305612 | [2020/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2019081517 | Date: | 02.05.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/18] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP3700513 | Date: | 02.09.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.05.2019 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3700513 | Date: | 24.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/34] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 20.06.2019 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/137, A61K31/365, A61K31/381, A61K31/343, A61P11/06, A61P17/00, A61P29/00, A61P17/06, A61P1/00, C07D307/88, C07D201/00 | [2022/14] | CPC: |
A61K31/343 (EP,KR,US);
C07D307/88 (EP,KR);
A61K31/137 (EP);
A61K31/365 (EP);
A61K31/381 (EP);
A61P1/00 (EP,KR);
A61P1/04 (US);
A61P11/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/00 (EP,KR,US);
A61P17/06 (EP,KR,US);
A61P19/02 (US);
A61P27/14 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP,KR,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2020/36] | A61K31/137, A61K31/343, A61K31/381, C07D201/00, C07D307/88, A61P1/00, A61P17/06, A61P29/00, A61P17/00, A61P11/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/36] | Extension states | BA | 27.05.2020 | ME | 27.05.2020 | Validation states | KH | 27.05.2020 | MA | 27.05.2020 | MD | 27.05.2020 | TN | 27.05.2020 | Title | German: | NICHTSTEROIDALE SELEKTIVE GLUCOCORTICOID-REZEPTOR-AGONISTISCHE MODULATOREN (SEGRAMS) UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON | [2020/36] | English: | NON-STEROIDAL SELECTIVE GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR AGONISTIC MODULATORS (SEGRAMS) AND USES THEREOF | [2022/14] | French: | MODULATEURS AGONISTES DE RÉCEPTEURS DE GLUCOCORTICOÏDES SÉLECTIFS (SEGRAMS) NON STÉROÏDIENS ET LEURS UTILISATIONS | [2020/36] |
Former [2020/36] | NON-STEROIDAL SELECTIVE GLUCOCORTICOID RECEPTOR AGONISTIC MODULATORS (SEGRAMs) AND USES THEREOF | Entry into regional phase | 27.05.2020 | National basic fee paid | 27.05.2020 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.05.2020 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.04.2020 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.05.2020 | Examination requested [2020/36] | 27.05.2020 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.12.2020 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.02.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.09.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.2021 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.03.2022 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.07.2022 | Fee for grant paid | 13.07.2022 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 13.07.2022 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 25.05.2023 | No opposition filed within time limit [2023/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.10.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 23.10.2018 | AL | 24.08.2022 | BG | 24.08.2022 | CY | 24.08.2022 | CZ | 24.08.2022 | EE | 24.08.2022 | HR | 24.08.2022 | LT | 24.08.2022 | LV | 24.08.2022 | MC | 24.08.2022 | MK | 24.08.2022 | MT | 24.08.2022 | RO | 24.08.2022 | RS | 24.08.2022 | SI | 24.08.2022 | SK | 24.08.2022 | SM | 24.08.2022 | GR | 25.11.2022 | IS | 24.12.2022 | [2024/44] |
Former [2024/34] | HU | 23.10.2018 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
BG | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/27] | HU | 23.10.2018 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
MK | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/24] | HU | 23.10.2018 | |
AL | 24.08.2022 | ||
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2024/21] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CY | 24.08.2022 | ||
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/37] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SI | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/29] | AL | 24.08.2022 | |
CZ | 24.08.2022 | ||
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/25] | CZ | 24.08.2022 | |
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
MC | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/23] | CZ | 24.08.2022 | |
EE | 24.08.2022 | ||
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SK | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/22] | CZ | 24.08.2022 | |
HR | 24.08.2022 | ||
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RO | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/20] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
SM | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/12] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
IS | 24.12.2022 | ||
Former [2023/10] | HR | 24.08.2022 | |
LT | 24.08.2022 | ||
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
GR | 25.11.2022 | ||
Former [2023/09] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
LV | 24.08.2022 | ||
RS | 24.08.2022 | ||
Former [2023/08] | LT | 24.08.2022 | |
RS | 24.08.2022 | Cited in | International search | [XD]US6323199 (LEHMANN MANFRED [DE], et al) [XD] 1,3-10,17,19 * abstract * * column 1, line 29 - column 2, line 62 * * column 6, line 62 - column 10, line 38; example 42; claim - *; | [A]US2006040933 (JAROCH STEFAN [DE], et al) [A] 1,3-12,15,16 * abstract *; | [XI] - GUOQIANG HUA ET AL, "Glucocorticoid-induced tethered transrepression requires SUMOylation of GR and formation of a SUMO-SMRT/NCoR1-HDAC3 repressing complex", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, (20151228), vol. 113, no. 5, doi:10.1073/pnas.1522826113, ISSN 0027-8424, pages E635 - E643, XP055517008 [X] 1,3-12,15-19 * the whole document * [I] 2,13,14,20,21 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.1522826113 | [X] - MIKE BARKER ET AL, "Design and Synthesis of New Nonsteroidal Glucocorticoid Modulators through Application of an "Agreement Docking" Method", JOURNAL OF MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY, (20050701), vol. 48, no. 14, doi:10.1021/jm050345y, ISSN 0022-2623, pages 4507 - 4510, XP055517287 [X] 1,3-6,15-17,19 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/jm050345y | [A] - FOSTER A B, "Deuterium isotope effects in the metabolism of drugs and xenobiotics: implications for drug design", ADVANCES IN DRUG RESEA, ACADEMIC PRESS, LONDON, GB, (19850101), vol. 14, ISSN 0065-2490, pages 1 - 40, XP009086953 [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | Examination | - GUOQIANG HUA ET AL, "Glucocorticoid receptor modulators CpdX and CpdX-D3 exhibit the same in vivo antiinflammatory activities as synthetic glucocorticoids", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20190621), vol. 116, no. 28, doi:10.1073/pnas.1908258116, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 14191 - 14199 | by applicant | US5262165 | US5948433 | US6010715 | US6071531 | US6245804 | US6323199 | - NISSEN; YAMAMOTO, Genes Dev., (20000000), vol. 14, no. 18, pages 2314 - 29 | - YANG-YEN et al., Cell, (19900000), vol. 62, no. 6, pages 1205 - 15 | - SURJIT et al., Cell, (20110000), vol. 145, no. 2, pages 224 - 41 | - CARRYER et al., J Allergy, (19500000), vol. 21, no. 4, pages 282 - 7 | - ORAY et al., Expert Opin Drug Saf., (20160000), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 457 - 65 | - CURTIS et al., Arthritis Rheum., (20060000), vol. 55, no. 3, pages 420 - 6 | - PEREIRA et al., Clinics (Sao Paulo), (20100000), vol. 65, no. 11, pages 1197 - 1205 | - CLARK; BELVISI, Pharmacol Ther., (20120000), vol. 134, no. l, pages 54 - 67 | - SCHACKE et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A., (20040000), vol. 101, no. l, pages 227 - 32 | - VAYSSIERE et al., Mol Endocrinol., (19970000), vol. 11, no. 9, pages 1245 - 55 | - BELVISI et al., J Immunol., (20010000), vol. 166, no. 3, pages 1975 - 82 | - CAVET et al., Mol Vis., (20100000), vol. 16, pages 1791 - 1800 | - SHAFIEE et al., Invest Ophthalmol Vis Sci., (20110000), vol. 52, no. 3, pages 1422 - 30 | - HUA et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci USA, (20160000), vol. 113, no. 5, pages 635 - 43 | - USSAR et al., PLoS Genet., (20080000), vol. 4, no. 12, page el000289 | - BRITTO et al., Am J Physiol Endocrinol Metab., (20140000), vol. 307, no. 11, pages 983 - 93 | - BAIDA et al., EMBO Mol Med., (20150000), vol. 7, no. l, pages 42 - 58 | - LI et al., Proc Natl Acad Sci U S A, (20060000), vol. 103, no. 31, pages 11736 - 41 | - PEARLMAN et al., Ann Allergy Asthma Immunol., (19970000), vol. 78, no. 4, pages 356 - 62 | - VINTER et al., Br J Dermatol., (20150000), vol. 172, no. 2, pages 345 - 53 | - INGLIS et al., Arthritis Res Ther., (20070000), vol. 9, no. 5, page 113 | - GEBOES et al., Arthritis Rheum., (20090000), vol. 60, no. 2, pages 390 - 5 | - GIMENES et al., Experimental Eye Research, (20150000), vol. 134, pages 24 - 32 | - SCHOEPE et al., Exp Dermatol., (20060000), vol. 15, no. 6, pages 406 - 20 | - CANALIS, Curr Opin Rheumatol., (20030000), vol. 15, no. 4, pages 454 - 7 | - GRAHNEMO et al., J Endocrinol., (20150000), vol. 224, no. 1, pages 97 - 108 | - ZHENG et al., PLoS Genet., (20120700), vol. 8, no. 7, page el002745 | - COHEN, Semin Immunol., (19920000), vol. 4, no. 6, pages 363 - 9 | - CLORE; THURBY-HAY, Endocr Pract., (20090000), vol. 15, no. 5, pages 469 - 74 | - GEER et al., Endocrinol Metab Clin North Am., (20140000), vol. 43, no. 1, pages 75 - 102 | - KIM et al., PLoS One, (20140000), vol. 9, no. 6, page e97841 | - ARANHA et al., Eur J Gastroenterol Hepatol., (20080000), vol. 20, no. 6, pages 519 - 25 |