EP3613261 - LIGHT EMITTING DIODE LIGHT SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.09.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 13.08.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Refusal of application | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Verdant Lighting Technology, Inc. 14026 Sherburn Manor Dr. Cypress, Texas 77429 / US | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Qian 14026 Sherburn Manor Dr. Cypress, Texas 77429 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Felber, Josef, et al Felber & Partner AG Dufourstrasse 116 8008 Zürich / CH | [2020/09] | Application number, filing date | 18786982.1 | 20.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US28648 | Priority number, date | US201762488621P | 21.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762488621 P | US201762488622P | 21.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762488622 P | US201762488607P | 21.04.2017 Original published format: US 201762488607 P | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018195479 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3613261 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2020 | Classification | IPC: | H05B45/20, H05B47/19, A01G7/04 | [2020/40] | CPC: |
H05B45/20 (EP,US);
A01G7/045 (EP,KR);
F21S10/02 (US);
H05B47/19 (EP,US);
F21W2131/109 (US)
|
Former IPC [2020/09] | H05B37/02, F21Y113/10, F21Y115/10, H05B35/00, H05B39/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Title | German: | LED-LICHTSYSTEM | [2020/09] | English: | LIGHT EMITTING DIODE LIGHT SYSTEM | [2020/09] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ÉCLAIRAGE À DIODES ÉLECTROLUMINESCENTES | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 21.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 21.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 24.03.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.08.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.01.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.11.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.04.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.05.2024 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 06.06.2024 | 06.06.2024 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.06.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2024/42] | 13.06.2024 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2024/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 14.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2012140634 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [X] 1-7,10-15 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0070]; figures 1, 2 *; | [X]WO2016051207 (INTELLIGENT GROWTH SOLUTIONS LTD [GB]) [X] 1,2,7-11,15 * page 19 - page 22; figures 1-6 *; | [X]US2016255687 (ZHANG XIANHUI [CN], et al) [X] 1,10* paragraph [0079] - paragraph [0100]; figures 3-7 * | International search | [Y]US4030118 (DISCHERT ROBERT ADAMS) [Y] 5-7, 17, 18 * entire document *; | [XY]US7394210 (ASHDOWN IAN [CA]) [X] 1-4, 8, 13-16, 19 * entire document * [Y] -5-7, 9-12, 17, 18, 20; | [Y]US8427311 (SCHLANGEN LUCAS JOSEF MARIA [NL], et al) [Y] 9, 20 * entire document *; | [Y]CN204362361U (TIANJIN XIANGYURUNDA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [Y] 12 * entire document *; | [Y]US9609859 (STOWE TIMOTHY DAVID [US], et al) [Y] 10-12 * entire document *; | [A] - "Electromagnetic Spectrum", GSP 216 Introduction to Remote Sensing, (20180618), URL: http://gsp.humboldt.edu/olm_2015/Courses/GSP_216_Online/lesson1-2/spectrum.html, XP055553360 [A] 3, 15 * entire document * | by applicant | WO2012140634 | US2016055687 | WO2016051207 |