|
13.06.2024 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.06.2024 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
13.06.2024 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.06.2024 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.05.2024 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2024 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.05.2024 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2024 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
20.12.2023 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
26 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Description |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Modified abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.04.2023 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
23.02.2023 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.02.2023 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2023 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.02.2023 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.11.2022 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.01.2022 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2022 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2021 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.12.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2021 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2021 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2021 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.08.2021 |
Examination started |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2021 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amended drawings filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amended drawings with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.03.2021 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.09.2020 |
Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Information on Search Strategy |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.08.2020 |
Supplementary European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.01.2020 |
Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.12.2019 |
Communication regarding possible amendment of the application/payment of claims fee |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
11.12.2019 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.11.2019 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.11.2019 |
Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability |
Search / examination |
8 |
|
20.10.2019 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.10.2019 |
Request for entry into the European phase |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
30.08.2019 |
Information on entry into European phase |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
55 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
48 |
|
15.11.2018 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Copy of the international search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.10.2018 |
Published international application - A1 |
Search / examination |
41 |