13.09.2024 |
Refusal of application |
published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] |
12.06.2024 |
New entry: Despatch of communication that application is refused |
|
14.05.2024 |
New entry: Date of cancellation oral proceedings |
|
29.04.2024 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
19.12.2023 |
New entry: Date of oral proceedings |
|
17.04.2023 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
14.04.2023 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
20.02.2023 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
04.11.2022 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.04.2022 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.02.2022 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
13.12.2021 |
Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
14.08.2021 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
13.08.2021 |
First examination report |
|
30.04.2021 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
26.03.2021 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
29.08.2020 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
28.08.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
28.08.2020 |
Change - classification |
published on 30.09.2020 [2020/40] |
26.06.2020 |
Change: Validation states |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
26.06.2020 |
Change - extension states |
published on 29.07.2020 [2020/31] |
21.04.2020 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
24.01.2020 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
24.01.2020 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 26.02.2020 [2020/09] |
02.01.2020 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.12.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
02.12.2019 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
22.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
13.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
08.11.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
25.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
21.10.2019 |
Change - representative |
|
21.10.2019 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
07.11.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
27.10.2018 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|