EP3612761 - COUPLER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 17.07.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 17.12.2021 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.01.2020 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.10.2018 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.08.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PL, SK | published on 04.09.2024 [2024/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cobalt Coupler Systems, LLC 3813 Canal Drive Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | [2020/09] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBS, Jon Joseph 405 N. Cr 3 Fort Collins, CO 80524 / US | 02 /
JACOBS, Lonnie Joseph 2941 Living Springs Lane Fort Collins, CO 80526 / US | 03 /
NOYER, Robert Wayne 6062 E. CR 74 Carr, CO 80612 / US | 04 /
SEATON, Lioyd Dale 8757 Longs Peak Circle Windsor, CO 80550 / US | [2020/09] | Representative(s) | Kador & Partner Part mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | [2023/50] |
Former [2020/09] | Kador & Partner PartG mbB Corneliusstraße 15 80469 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 18787932.5 | 06.04.2018 | [2020/09] | WO2018US26587 | Priority number, date | US201715490691 | 18.04.2017 Original published format: US201715490691 | US201715678015 | 15.08.2017 Original published format: US201715678015 | [2020/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2018194871 | Date: | 25.10.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/43] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3612761 | Date: | 26.02.2020 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.10.2018 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2020/09] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3612761 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.10.2018 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.01.2021 | Classification | IPC: | F16L21/08, F16L37/02, F16L37/08, F16L37/091 | [2020/09] | CPC: |
F16L37/091 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2020/09] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | KOPPLER | [2020/09] | English: | COUPLER | [2020/09] | French: | ÉLÉMENT D'ACCOUPLEMENT | [2020/09] | Entry into regional phase | 18.11.2019 | National basic fee paid | 18.11.2019 | Search fee paid | 18.11.2019 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.11.2019 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.11.2019 | Examination requested [2020/09] | 18.08.2021 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 16.12.2021 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.07.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 26.09.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.01.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.03.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.07.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.11.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.11.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.11.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.04.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.04.2021 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 13.12.2023 | ES | 13.12.2023 | HR | 13.12.2023 | PL | 13.12.2023 | RO | 13.12.2023 | RS | 13.12.2023 | SK | 13.12.2023 | SM | 13.12.2023 | NO | 13.03.2024 | GR | 14.03.2024 | IS | 13.04.2024 | [2024/36] |
Former [2024/35] | CZ | 13.12.2023 | |
ES | 13.12.2023 | ||
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RO | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/33] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
SM | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/32] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
IS | 13.04.2024 | ||
Former [2024/24] | ES | 13.12.2023 | |
HR | 13.12.2023 | ||
RS | 13.12.2023 | ||
NO | 13.03.2024 | ||
GR | 14.03.2024 | ||
Former [2024/20] | GR | 14.03.2024 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]DE2609576 (GEBERT & CIE JONA) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 *[A] 3-15; | [XA]FR2747453 (ARNCO CORP [US]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * [A] 3-15; | [XAI]FR2777341 (COMAP [FR]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * [A] 12-15 [I] 5-11; | [XAI]US2004239115 (WILK CHARLES E [US], et al) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * [A] 12-15 [I] 5-11; | [XAI]EP2677225 (MUELLER IND INC [US]) [X] 1-4 * figure 1 * [A] 11-15 [I] 5-10; | [XA]FR3001023 (HUOT [FR]) [X] 1,2 * figure 1 * [A] 3-15 | International search | [XY]US1949451 (BRULATOUR JOHN L) [X] 1-7, 18, 19, 23-28, 32-44 * ; figure 1; page 2, lines 40-60 * [Y] 8-17, 20-22, 29-31, 45-80; | [Y]GB1372241 (WAVIN BV) [Y] 8-17, 20-22, 29-31, 45-80 * ; figure 4; page 3, lines 1-10 *; | [Y]US5553895 (KARL TERRY L [US], et al) [Y] 30, 67-69 * ; column 4, lines 50-55 *; | [A]US5769460 (IMAI KAZUHISA [JP]) [A] 1-80* ; entire document *; | [Y]US2010194098 (HENNEMANN THOMAS L [US], et al) [Y] 31, 68, 69, 79, 80 * ; figures 1-3; paragraph [0033] * |